Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tarczynski, Matthew, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Peereboom, Esq., Wayne H, against Kashif, Irfan, represented by Crowley, Jr., Esq., James C, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2017 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Pre-Trial ORDER: Trial with jury April 2019 trial list Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel
Date: January 28, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: January 28, 2019Affidavit of James c. Crowley
Date: April 03, 2018Plaintiff Matthew Tarczynski's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s)
Date: March 19, 2018Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/25/2017
Date: May 25, 2017Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 25, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Matthew Tarczynski's original complaint | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 07/02/2019 Judge: Mason, Hon. Mark D
Judge: Mason, Mark |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 06/03/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Wayne H Peereboom, Esq. Attorney: James C Crowley, Jr., Esq. | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 05/06/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event trial to the June list (#14.0): ALLOWED Judge: Mason, Hon. Mark D
Judge: Mason, Mark |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Matthew Tarczynski's Joint Motion to continue / reschedule an event 05/06/2019 09:00 AM Trial Ready to the June trial list | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendant Irfan Kashif Doing Business as Dairy Market's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer as evidence: medical bills pursuant to G.L. c.233, § 79G | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 04/01/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Mark D Mason, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event April trial list to the May trial list (#12.0): ALLOWED Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.