Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Biladeau, Jason, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Moriarty, Esq., Marshall Theodore, against Division Of Insurance, Board Of Appeal, Registrar Of Motor Vehicles, represented by Datres, Esq., Julie Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Endorsement on Motion to stay an action (#4.0): ALLOWED
Date: December 09, 2016Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Jason Biladeau's original complaint
Date: January 23, 2017Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 09/23/2016
Date: September 23, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Jason Biladeau's original complaint | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to stay an action (#4.0): ALLOWED | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Registrar of Motor Vehicles's Assented to Motion to stay an action | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Lynn Datres, Esq. added for Defendant Registrar of Motor Vehicles | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 09/23/2016 | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint filed for Judicial Review pursuant to G.L. c.30A, §14 | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Marshall Theodore Moriarty, Esq. added for Plaintiff Jason Biladeau |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.