Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Salem Place Condominium Trust, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Basch, Esq., Adam John, against Spring Associates, Inc., T.D. Bank, N.A., in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeLiens |
AMENDED ORDER: Findings and Order
Date: September 26, 2016Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i)
Date: December 27, 2016Endorsement on motion to amend findings and judgment (#11.0): ALLOWED
Date: September 20, 2016Plaintiff Salem Place Condominium Trust's EMERGENCY Motion to amend the findings and order.
Date: September 20, 2016ORDER: Findings and Order
Date: March 10, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Spring Associates, Inc.: Service made in hand;
Date: January 14, 2016Service Returned for Defendant T.D. Bank, N.A.: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: January 05, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 12/15/2015
Date: December 15, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER: Findings and Order | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to amend findings and judgment (#11.0): ALLOWED | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Salem Place Condominium Trust's EMERGENCY Motion to amend the findings and order. | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: Findings and Order | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for assessment of damages (#9.0): and entry of Default Judgment Other action taken After hearing, Findings and Order to issue. | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 03/10/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Adam Basch in support of plaintiff;s motion for entry of default judgment and assessment of damages. | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Donna Golec in support of plaintiff's motion foe entry of default judgment and assessment of damages. | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Salem Place Condominium Trust's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(2) Applies To: Spring Associates, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.