Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kielson, David, Kielson, Gail, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gogel, Esq., Kenneth J, Sanes, Esq., Scott Adam, against Cooley Dickinson Hospital, Drinker, M.D., Henry, Johnson, M.D., Brian D, Lim, M.D., Albert, Pioneer Valley Anesthesia,Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Burke, Esq., Michael H, Canepa, Esq., Kristine Marie, Cobbs, Esq., Rebecca A, Dailey, Iii, Esq., William J, Dailey, Jr., Esq., William J, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Bertha D. Josephson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Brian D Johnson, M.D.'s amended complaint
Date: December 18, 2017Verdict of jury for party Applies To: Lim, M.D., Albert (Defendant) defendant Albert Lim, M.D.
Date: December 15, 2017Response to to Defendants Motion for directed verdict filed by
Date: December 12, 2017Endorsement on Motion for Directed Verdict filed (#79.0): DENIED Judge: Rup, Hon. Mary-Lou
Date: December 12, 2017General correspondence regarding Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Verdict slip
Date: November 28, 2017Juror Voir Dire questions filed by: Plaintiff David Kielson, Gail Kielson
Date: November 24, 2017Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: April 03, 2017Plaintiff David Kielson's Motion to amend the amended complaint (unapposed)
Date: April 03, 2017Received from Defendant Lim, M.D., Albert: Answer to amended complaint;
Date: September 12, 2016Received from Defendant Drinker, M.D., Henry: Answer to amended complaint;
Date: August 29, 2016Received from Defendant Johnson, M.D., Brian D: Answer to amended complaint;
Date: August 22, 2016Amended: amended complaint filed by David Kielson, Gail Kielson
Date: August 11, 2016Endorsement on Motion to amend the complaint (#26.0): ALLOWED
Date: August 11, 2016Affidavit of Attorney Murphy
Date: July 07, 2016General correspondence regarding Agreed Revised Tracking Order
Date: November 30, 2015Plaintiff David Kielson's Assented to Motion to advance for speedy trial.
Date: November 09, 2015Received from Defendant Johnson, M.D., Brian D: Answer to original complaint;
Date: July 29, 2015Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 07/03/2015
Date: July 03, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibits Destroyed | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to claim trial exhibits on or before 07/23/2021 | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Board of Registration in Medicine of Waiver of Tribunal. Re:Brian D Johnson, M.D., Linda Preston, M.D. copies of Dispositions | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Board of Registration in Medicine of Disposition. | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Kenneth J Gogel, Esq. Attorney: Scott Adam Sanes, Esq. Attorney: William J Dailey, III, Esq. Attorney: Jason M Morales, Esq. Attorney: William J Dailey, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Michael H Burke, Esq. Attorney: Christopher J Visser, Esq. Attorney: Jason M Morales, Esq. Attorney: Rebecca A Cobbs, Esq. Attorney: Joan O Vorster, Esq. Attorney: Kristine Marie Canepa, Esq. Attorney: Patrick Matthew Winn, Esq. | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Preston, M.D., Linda: Dismissed by agreement of parties; | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Kenneth J Gogel, Esq. Attorney: Scott Adam Sanes, Esq. Attorney: William J Dailey, III, Esq. Attorney: Jason M Morales, Esq. Attorney: William J Dailey, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Rebecca A Cobbs, Esq. Attorney: Michael H Burke, Esq. Attorney: Christopher J Visser, Esq. Attorney: Allison Kristina Murphy, Esq. Attorney: Joan O Vorster, Esq. Attorney: Kristine Marie Canepa, Esq. | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 02/22/2018 AS TO DEFENDANT BRIAN D. JOHNSON ONLY VACATED, STIPULATION AS TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON WAS PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 12/18/17. Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Linda Preston, M.D.'s amended complaint Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT on jury verdict for the Defendant(s), Albert Lim, M.D., Pioneer Valley Anesthesia,LLC against Plaintiff(s), David Kielson, Gail Kielson, who will not recover statutory costs. Judge: Rup, Hon. Mary-Lou
Judge: Rup, Mary-Lou |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.