Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Hovan, Ashley E, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts Essex County Probate and Family Court with Anderson, Hon. Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderson, Hon. Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseEssex County Probate and Family Court |
This complaint is a petition for informal probate and appointment of a personal representative in the probate of the will of John Barry Hovan. The petitioner, Ashle! Hovan, is seeking to be appointed as the personal representative named in the decede...
Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Affidavit Of Suspicious Death
Date: March 26, 2024Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: March 26, 2024Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: March 26, 2024Devisees
Date: March 26, 2024Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: March 26, 2024Permanent Bond With Corporate Sureties Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Will dated June 20, 2022, 3 pages
Date: March 26, 2024Petition for Informal Probate
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 03/27/2024 09:37:29 | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative DATED 3/26/2024 Judge: Casey O'Brien, Pamela A | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 03/26/2024, by Pamela A Casey O'Brien Judge: Casey O'Brien, Pamela A | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Suspicious Death | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Eric J. Hovan Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Devisees | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Stephanie L. Hovan Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.