We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Crespo, Efrain Vs. Swanton, Scott Gregory Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Crespo, Efrain, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cafasso, Esq., Marc, against J And S Transport Co. Inc., Swanton, Scott Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with Drechsler, Thomas presiding.

Case Details for Crespo, Efrain v. J And S Transport Co. Inc. , et al.

Judge

Drechsler, Thomas

Filing Date

October 25, 2023

Category

Torts

Last Refreshed

January 23, 2024

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Essex County, MA

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Complaint Summary

This complaint was filed by Efrain Crespo against Scott Gregory Swanton and J and S Transport Co. Inc. The plaintiff, Efrain Crespo, is an individual residing in Haverhill, Essex County, Massachusetts. The defendant, Scott Gregory Swanton, is an indi...

Parties for Crespo, Efrain v. J And S Transport Co. Inc. , et al.

Plaintiffs

Crespo, Efrain

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Cafasso, Esq., Marc

Defendants

J And S Transport Co. Inc.

Swanton, Scott Gregory

Case Events for Crespo, Efrain v. J And S Transport Co. Inc. , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Endorsement on Motion to Attend the Pre-Trial Conference via Zoom (#6.0): DENIED After review, the motion is DENIED. Judge: Howe, Hon. Janice W
Docket Event Event Result:: 1 Trial Hearing scheduled on: 01/09/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Comments: Change in Court's schedule. Hon. Janice W Howe, Presiding Staff: Stefano J Cornelio, Assistant Clerk Magistrate

Judge: Howe, Janice W

Docket Event Plaintiff Efrain Crespo's Motion to Attend Via Zoom (1 Trial Hearing)
Docket Event Event Result:: 1 Trial Hearing scheduled on: 01/09/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Transferred to another session Comments: Moved into the "C" Session Hon. Janice W Howe, Presiding Staff: Debra Vernava, Assistant Clerk Magistrate

Judge: Howe, Janice W

Docket Event Request for hearing filed Applies To: Crespo, Efrain (Plaintiff)
Docket Event Service Returned for Defendant J and S Transport Co. Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;
Docket Event One Trial entry of dismissal nisi S.J.C. "Order Regarding Amount in Controversy". Judge: Drechsler, Hon. Thomas

Judge: Drechsler, Thomas

Docket Event Service Returned for Defendant Swanton, Scott Gregory: Service made at last and usual place of abode of Scott Gregory Swanton, 75 Vine Street Apt 5 Saugus MA 01906 and by mailing first class to the above address on 11/17/2023.
Docket Event Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 10/26/2023
Docket Event Demand for jury trial entered.
See all events