Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gray, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Newton, Esq., Michelle, against D&T Pest And Termite Control, Inc., Lecuyer, Richard, represented by Long, Esq., Christopher G, Zuares, Esq., David J, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 28, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 28, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/28/2021
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, without costs and all rights of appeal waived. Applies To: Newton, Esq., Michelle (Attorney) on behalf of Gray, Michael (Plaintiff); Zuares, Esq., David J (Attorney) on behalf of Lecuyer, Richard (Defendant) | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert J Murphy, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant D&T Pest and Termite Control, Inc. | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert J Murphy, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Richard Lecuyer | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Compel the Physical Examination of Plaintiff (#6.0): ALLOWED Upon review, the plaintiff seeks to recover damages for injuries sustained in a motor vehicle accident. As plaintiff's injuries are in controversy, the motion is ALLOWED. Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Motion Hearing to Compel scheduled on: 01/26/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Comments: Judge decided motion on papers Hon. William M White, Jr., Presiding | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to #6 Defendant's Motion to Compel Rule 35 Examination filed by Michael Gray | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/22/2021 10:37:13 | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David J Zuares, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Richard Lecuyer | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Richard Lecuyer, D&T Pest and Termite Control, Inc.'s Memorandum in support of Emergency Motion to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.