Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alves, Antonia V, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown, Esq., Stephen Samuel, Markey, Jr., Esq., John Allen, against Estate Of George Elvis Hodge, Hodge, Lezan, Lima, Goncalo, Motorcade, Llc, Paylee, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Harkavy, Esq., John, Mathieu, Esq., John P, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Jackie A. Cowin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Defendant Elliot Schneider's Motion for Speedy Trial.
Date: April 05, 2022MEMORANDUM & ORDER: on Motions Relating to Summary Judgment (P15-17) Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Date: December 27, 2021Endorsement on Motion to strike (#17.0): DENIED Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Date: December 27, 2021Plaintiff Antonia V Alves's Response to Defendants' Rule 9A(b)(5) Statement of Facts
Date: December 22, 2021Affidavit of John A. Markey, Jr.
Date: December 02, 2021Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion filed by Elliot Schneider, Motorcade, LLC
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER: re: Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Date: December 07, 2021Defendants Motorcade, LLC, Elliot Schneider's Statement of Facts
Date: September 22, 2021Motorcade, LLC, Elliot Schneider's Memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 22, 2021Defendants Motorcade, LLC, Elliot Schneider's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56
Date: September 22, 2021Opposition to #13 Defendants' Special Motion to Dismiss filed by Antonia V Alves
Date: April 14, 2021Affidavit of Elliot Schneider in Support of Special Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 14, 2021Defendants Elliot Schneider, Motorcade, LLC's Motion for special motion to dismiss
Date: April 14, 2021Service Returned for Defendant Paylee, LLC: Service made at last and usual;
Date: March 05, 2021Service Returned for Defendant Hodge, Lezan: Service made at last and usual;
Date: March 05, 2021Affidavit of Lezan Hodge in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Lis Pendens
Date: February 25, 2021Plaintiff(s) Antonia V Alves's Motion for a Memorandum of Lis Pendens
Date: January 29, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: January 29, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: January 29, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 01/29/2021
Date: January 29, 2021Affidavit of Acceptance of Service
Date: September 22, 20223rd Party Complaint filed.
Date: October 07, 2022Endorsement on Motion to File a Counterclaim (#27.0): ALLOWED
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER: of Transfer and Assignment
Date: September 12, 2022Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: November 17, 2022Answer to the Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint filed by Toni Alves and Goncalo Lima
Date: September 21, 2022ORDER: on Requests for Default (Nos. 53, 55 and 56) Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Date: January 31, 2023Entered as to: Defendant Hodge, Lezan: Defaulted by 55(a) request;
Date: January 31, 2023Counterclaim filed.
Date: October 07, 2022Affidavit in Support of Request for Default
Date: December 22, 2022Affidavit that Defendant Lezan Hodge is not in the Military
Date: December 22, 2022Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A
Date: December 22, 2022Entered as to: Defendant Estate of George Elvis Hodge: Defaulted by 55(a) request;
Date: January 26, 2023Affidavit in Support of Request for Default
Date: December 22, 2022Antonia V Alves's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Hodge, Lezan (Defendant)
Date: January 26, 2023Antonia V Alves's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Paylee, LLC (Defendant)
Date: January 26, 2023ORDER: on Motion for Reconsideration (No. 26) Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Date: December 05, 2022Defendant Motorcade, LLC's Motion for an Interim Order for Use and Occupancy Payments
Date: October 24, 2022Antonia V Alves's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Paylee, LLC (Defendant)
Date: December 22, 2022Antonia V Alves's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Estate of George Elvis Hodge (Defendant)
Date: December 22, 2022Affidavit in Support of Request for Default
Date: December 22, 2022Affidavit that Defendant Estate of George Elvis Hodge is not in the Military
Date: December 22, 2022Witness list (JOINT) Applies To: Alves, Antonia V (Plaintiff); Lima, Goncalo (Defendant)
Date: January 13, 2023Request for Jury instructions filed by Defendant Motorcade, LLC
Date: January 13, 2023Antonia V Alves's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Hodge, Lezan (Defendant)
Date: December 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Status: Defendant Hodge, Lezan: Inactive: Suggestion of Bankruptcy; | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)1 After Judicial Finding Presiding: Hon. Jackie Cowin Judgment For: Antonia V Alves Judgment Against: Estate of George Elvis Hodge Paylee, LLC Lezan Hodge Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 01/29/2021 Jdgmnt Date: 03/22/2023 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 100000.00 Filing Fees: 275.00 Judgment Total: 126,002.80 | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment and Assessment of Damages against Defendants, Lezan Hodge, estate of George E. Hodge and Paylee, LLC (#61.0): Other action taken These defendants having been defaulted, and the amount sought being a "sum certain" as established by the verified complaint, judgment in the amount of $100,000.00 shall enter against these defendants. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Antonia V Alves's Motion for Default Judgment and assessment of damages against defendants, Lezan Hodge, Estate of George E. Hodge and Paylee, LLC | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER: ORDER after Status Conference: The deadline for Plaintiff, Alves, to serve and file requests for Default Judgment and Assessment of Damages is extended to on or before April 3, 2023. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John P Mathieu, Esq. added for Defendant Lezan Hodge | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 03/07/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Jackie Cowin, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff John Allen Markey, Jr., Esq., Private Counsel Defendant John P Mathieu, Esq., Staff: Kellee-Sue Milord, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV B, Court Reporter
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for Default (#47.0): Other action taken See Order on #55. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie Applies To: Hodge, Lezan (Defendant) | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER: on Requests for Default (Nos. 53, 55 and 56) Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for Default (#53.0): ALLOWED See separate Order. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie Applies To: Estate of George Elvis Hodge (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.