Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Hennessey, Esq., Christopher, against Steven Michael Diamond, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: May 12, 2022Affidavit Military Affidavit.
Date: June 02, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Steven Michael Diamond Judgment Creditor: Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 08/24/2022 Judgment Total: 775,014.98 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 9,179.28 Execution Subtotal: 784,194.26 Execution Total: 784,194.26 | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for execution against Steven Michael Diamond FILED Applies To: Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff); Hennessey, Esq., Christopher (Attorney) on behalf of Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff) | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. John A Agostini Judgment For: Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc Judgment Against: Steven Michael Diamond Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/12/2022 Jdgmnt Date: 07/19/2022 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 757748.20 Filing Fees: 255.00 Other Costs: 59.44 Judgment Total: 775,014.98 | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#7.0): ALLOWED in the amount of $757,748.20 (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff); Steven Michael Diamond (Defendant); Hennessey, Esq., Christopher (Attorney) on behalf of Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 07/18/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Motion Hearing on 07/18/22 at 2:00 p.m. ZOOM SESSION - Request for Default Judgment Under Rule 55(b)(1) for Sum Certain Notice sent to Counsel and Steven Michael Diamond at 462 Henderson Road, Williamstown, MA 01237 Sent On: 06/24/2022 11:05:19 | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Matthew Sauer in Support of Request for Default Judgment. FILED Applies To: Hennessey, Esq., Christopher (Attorney) on behalf of Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff) | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc's Request for Default Judgment Under Rule 55(b)(1) for Sum Certain. FILED Applies To: Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff); Hennessey, Esq., Christopher (Attorney) on behalf of Mds Wealth Advisors, Llc (Plaintiff) | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff, Attorney: Christopher Hennessey, Esq. Cohen Kinne Valicenti and Cook, LLP 28 North St 3rd Floor, Pittsfield, MA 01201 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Steven Michael Diamond: Defaulted by 55(a) request; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.