Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pirzl, John H, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A, against Bradley, Kelsey, represented by Garrity, Esq., Michael, Reisbig, Esq., Katharine Elyse, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Received from Defendant Bradley, Kelsey: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 25, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal FILED Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Pirzl, John H (Plaintiff); Garrity, Esq., Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Bradley, Kelsey (Defendant) | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Attorney Michael P. Garrity is entering an appearance and Attorney David Cain is withdrawing his appearance. FILED Applies To: Cain, Esq., David R (Attorney) on behalf of Bradley, Kelsey (Defendant); Garrity, Esq., Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Bradley, Kelsey (Defendant) | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael Garrity, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Kelsey Bradley | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David R Cain, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Kelsey Bradley | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for sanctions for failure to comply with order on plaintiff's motion compel, FILED. (#11.0): ALLOWED ALLOWED to the extent that the defendant's comparative negligence defense is stricken. The plaintiff is still entitled to interrogatory answers of the defendant and they shall be filed by 08/13/2021. Failure to file such discovery by that date will be subject to more sanctions including a default. The attorney fee request is DENIED. | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2) for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. FILED. Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Pirzl, John H (Plaintiff) | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff John H Pirzl's Notice of Filing and List of Documents. 1.) Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; 2.) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; 3.) Affidavit of Compliance. FILED. Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Pirzl, John H (Plaintiff) | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court 9A. FILED. Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Pirzl, John H (Plaintiff) | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff John H Pirzl's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)) FILED Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Pirzl, John H (Plaintiff) | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David R Cain, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Kelsey Bradley FILED Applies To: Bradley, Kelsey (Defendant); Cain, Esq., David R (Attorney) on behalf of Bradley, Kelsey (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.