Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Steamroller Llc, Steamroller Llc An Iowa Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reynolds Jeremiah, against Crahan Michael Shawn, Knot Productions Llc, Knot Productions Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Slipknot Inc., Slipknot Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 8) See All represented by S. Trugman Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: STEAMROLLER, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: October 04, 2023Reply Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike; Filed by: SLIPKNOT, LLC (Defendant)
Date: October 16, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: STEAMROLLER, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: October 12, 2023Complaint
Date: June 08, 2023Separate Statement; Filed by: STEAMROLLER, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-07T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 19, 2024Certificate of Mailing for Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 19, 2024Declaration OF KATHERINE PIERUCCI; Filed by: STEAMROLLER, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: March 07, 2024Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: SLIPKNOT, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Declaration OF ANNIE GASTER; Filed by: STEAMROLLER, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: March 07, 2024Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: STEAMROLLER, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 08, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 08, 2023Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: June 08, 2023Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2023Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: June 08, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.