Related Content
in Orange County
Case
24D005007
Jul 12, 2024 |
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD |
24D005007
Ruling
2024CUPT024338 IN THE MATTER OF: SADIE ALLYSON SCHAAB
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY OF VENTURA
Tentative Ruling
2024CUPT024338: IN THE MATTER OF: SADIE ALLYSON SCHAAB
07/09/2024 in Department 21
OSC - Name Change
The morning calendar in courtroom 21 will normally begin between 8:30 and 8:45 a.m. Please
arrive at the courtroom no later than 8:30 a.m. The door will be opened before the calendar is
called.
The Court allows appearances by CourtCall but is not equipped for Zoom. If appearing by
CourtCall, call in no later than 8:15 a.m. If you intend to appear by CourtCall, you must make
arrangements with CourtCall by 4:00 p.m. the day before your scheduled hearing. Requests for
approval of a CourtCall appearance made on the morning of the hearing will not be granted. No
exceptions will be made.
With respect to the tentative ruling below, no notice of intent to appear is required. If you wish to
submit on the tentative ruling you can fax notice to Judge Riley's secretary, Ms. Sedillos at
805-289-8705, stating that you submit on the tentative. You may also email the Court at:
Courtroom21@ventura.courts.ca.gov with all counsel copied on the email. Do not call in lieu of
sending a fax or email. If you submit on the tentative without appearing and the opposing party
appears, the hearing will be conducted in your absence. If you are the moving party and do not
communicate to the Court that you submit on the tentative or you do not appear at the hearing,
the Court may deny your motion irrespective of the tentative.
Unless stated otherwise at the hearing, if a formal order is not signed at the hearing, the
prevailing party shall prepare a proposed order and comply with CRC 3.1312 subdivisions (a),
(b), (d) and (e). The signed order shall be served on all parties and a proof of service filed with
the court. A "notice of ruling" in lieu of this procedure is not authorized.
Tentative Ruling
The Court GRANTS the Petition for name change.
Analysis
Petitioner resides in this county. (¶ 1a; Code Civ. Proc., § 1276, subd. (a)).
Petitioner indicated she is not in state prison or on parole or in county jail and is not required to
register as a sex offender. (¶ 7f).
Proof of publication showing compliance with (Code Civ. Proc., § 1277, subd. (a)(3) filed on
6/7/24.
No CLETS report.
Ruling
Dunes Ranch Residential Community, LLC vs. Parsons, et al.
Jul 11, 2024 |
23CVG-00175
PARSONS, ET AL.
Case Number: 23CVG-00175
This matter is on calendar for status of accounting. The Inventory and Accounting have been filed
pursuant to California Civil Code section 798.61. The clerk is directed to close the file. No
appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
MARTINEZ VS RIVAS
Jul 11, 2024 |
FL-21-000664
FL-21-000664 – MARTINEZ VS RIVAS Petitioner’s Request for Order re “Other,” etc.—HEARING REQUIRED.
Judgment in this matter was entered on January 2, 2024 and provided, in relevant part, that Respondent was awarded as her separate property “the Youngstown property and the vacant lot in Turlock” with the obligation to remove Petitioner’s name from the deed(s) and any loans within no more than six (6) months at the latest, with the Court reserving jurisdiction over this matter expressly. (Judgment, p. 18 of 22, ¶ No. 2.)
Petitioner asks that the Court order Respondent to comply but the Judgment itself is already an order and the parties are each required to cooperate in effectuating the terms of the judgment. Respondent’s declaration states that she has been diligently pursuing the necessary refinance but that Petitioner’s own actions have made the process more difficult and more expensive by unilaterally cancelling the homeowner’s insurance coverage and by unilaterally terminating the automatic bank payments to the lender. It has been widely publicized and is a matter of common knowledge such that the Court may take judicial notice of the fact that major, nationwide insurance companies have been cancelling homeowner’s policies in California and have either sought to withdraw entirely from the California market or else are seeking large premium increases from the California Department of Insurance in order to remain in-market. (Evid. Code, §§ 451(f) [Facts and propositions of generalize knowledge that are so universally known that they cannot reasonably be the subject of dispute]; 452(g) [Facts and propositions that are of such common knowledge within the territorial jurisdiction of the court that they cannot reasonably be the subject of dispute]; 455(a) [court may take judicial notice on its own motion provided parties are given the opportunity to be heard].)
As such, subject to the testimony and evidence that may be offered at the hearing, the Court is inclined to deny Petitioner’s request without prejudice or else continue the hearing to allow Respondent further time to comply with the Judgment. Either way, the Court will continue to reserve jurisdiction over this issue and also the issue of whether either party’s conduct warrants the imposition of monetary sanctions and/or an award of fees and costs for failure to cooperate and comply with the terms of the Judgment. (Fam. Code, § 271.)
The following are the tentative ruling cases calendared before Judge J. Richard Distaso in Department #13:
THERE ARE NO TENTATIVES.
The following are the tentative ruling cases calendared before Judge Sweena Pannu in Department #14:
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: ANNE RUTLEDGE KNIGHT
Jul 12, 2024 |
24STCP01320
Case Number:
24STCP01320
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Ruling
In Re: Wedemeyer
Jul 10, 2024 |
24CV-0204666
IN RE: WEDEMEYER
Case Number: 24CV-0204666
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Phoebe Joy Wedemeyer seeks to change her name
to Phoebe Joy Mills. No proof of publication has been submitted. The Court requires a Certificate of Publication
from the publishing newspaper before the Petition may be granted. If the Certificate of Publication is provided,
the Court intends to grant the Petition, vacate all future dates, and close the file.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: MARIA FUENTES
Jul 12, 2024 |
24STCP00964
Case Number:
24STCP00964
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available
in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: OVI STEIN
Jul 12, 2024 |
24STCP01300
Case Number:
24STCP01300
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Ruling
JUAN AGUSTIN ARRIEROCRUZ vs. VICTORIA SOLIS FRAGA
Jul 15, 2024 |
22FC08235
No appearances are necessary. Case Management is continued to September 16, 2024 at 1:30 in Dept. 1. At CMC the parties shall be prepared to give specific information regarding outstanding discovery so the matter may be set for settlement conference and trial.