Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
East West Bank, East West Bank, A California State Banking Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hogan, Marshall J, against Herbl Inc, Herbl, Inc., A California Corporation,, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by East West Bank, a California state banking corporation, against Herbl, Inc., a California corporation. The complaint alleges three causes of action: breach of contract, appointment of a receiver, and injunction in aid of re...
96709Notic00b90a
Date: April 25, 2024Joinder_in_Motion_to_Distribute
Date: April 23, 2024Joinder_to_Opposition_to_Motion
Date: April 23, 2024REP
Date: April 22, 202496450CLAIM008ca8
Date: April 22, 2024PROOF
Date: April 17, 2024RJN
Date: April 17, 202496135Oppos005d0c
Date: April 17, 2024DEC
Date: April 17, 2024OPPOSITION
Date: April 17, 202496135Reque011801
Date: April 17, 202494967Super00f155
Date: March 29, 2024POS
Date: March 20, 2024MOTION
Date: March 20, 202493543Decla11785f
Date: March 09, 202493543Notic10c0c3
Date: March 09, 202493543Reque096474
Date: March 09, 202493543Appli084f4c
Date: March 09, 202493543Decla074c04
Date: March 09, 202493543Memor068b6a
Date: March 09, 202493543Decla05343f
Date: March 09, 202493543Decla045fe7
Date: March 09, 202493543Motio001198
Date: March 09, 202492832Super00a2e0
Date: February 28, 202491786Decla064fa0
Date: February 10, 202491786Memor059d6d
Date: February 10, 202491786Decla03abab
Date: February 10, 202491786Reque07b945
Date: February 10, 202491786Decla0227ad
Date: February 10, 202491786Appli04efaf
Date: February 10, 202491786Decla01af36
Date: February 10, 202491786Motio0084a6
Date: February 10, 202491492Notic000e68
Date: February 06, 202490857Super00779e
Date: January 27, 202489073SUPER007aca
Date: December 28, 2023NoE
Date: December 27, 2023MOTION
Date: December 27, 2023EX
Date: December 20, 202387574Super00d1dc
Date: November 30, 2023NOE
Date: November 30, 2023Ex Parte App
Date: November 16, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 23, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: June 20, 202377664Compl00224f
Date: June 20, 202377664Civil027886
Date: June 20, 202377664Civil01f90d
Date: June 20, 202377664Summo037570
Date: June 20, 2023Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Declaration re: Ex Parte Notice, Filed
Date: June 26, 202377971Decla019637
Date: June 26, 202377971Decla0365f7
Date: June 26, 202377971Oatho04af39
Date: June 26, 202377971Stipu05c7c1
Date: June 26, 202377971Proof07cdeb
Date: June 26, 202377971Decla02c8ab
Date: June 26, 202377971ExPar002cac
Date: June 26, 202378075Appli00ae49
Date: June 27, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Stipulation, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Declaration re: Ex Parte Notice, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Document, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filed
Date: June 27, 202378212Notic007c67
Date: June 29, 2023Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Order, Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 28, 202379816Super005d57
Date: July 31, 2023EX PARTE
Date: July 31, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: July 31, 2023Notice
Date: August 04, 2023NTC OF ENTRY
Date: August 12, 202381227DECLA0198a2
Date: August 22, 202381227EXPAR002496
Date: August 22, 2023EPA_repaired
Date: August 23, 2023N of Entry of Order re CMC
Date: August 23, 2023Opposition to Ex Parte
Date: August 24, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: August 24, 202381490Notic002d0c
Date: August 25, 202381488Notic004a6d
Date: August 25, 202381920Super003605
Date: August 31, 2023NOE
Date: September 05, 202383780Super003bba
Date: September 29, 2023OC149959. CMS
Date: October 03, 202385653Super006e5b
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 96709Notic00b90a | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Joinder_in_Motion_to_Distribute | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Joinder_to_Opposition_to_Motion | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | REP | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 96450CLAIM008ca8 | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | RJN | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 96135Oppos005d0c | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | DEC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.