Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
County Of Sonoma, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pittman, Robert Harmon, against David Scott Hansen As Ttee Of The Hansen Fam Trst Dated 3.16.11, Hansen, David Scott, Hansen, Regina Victoria, Regina Victoria Hansen As Ttee Of The Hansen Fam Trst Dated 3.16.11, The Hansen Family Trust, Dated March 16, 2011, (total of 5) See All represented by Rifkind, Leonard Arlan, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
4.22.24 CMC
Date: April 22, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: April 22, 2024Proof of Service
Date: April 22, 2024Answer by All Defendants
Date: March 07, 2024POS
Date: March 07, 2024POS Summons Hansen Trust David
Date: February 07, 2024POS Summons Hansen Trust Regina
Date: February 07, 2024POS Summons David Trustee
Date: February 07, 2024POS Summons Regina Trustee
Date: February 07, 2024Stipulated Preliminary Injunction
Date: February 05, 2024POS Stip Preliminary Injunction
Date: February 05, 2024Hansen_David_Sub_Attny_eFile
Date: February 01, 2024Hansen_Regina_Sub_Attny_eFile
Date: February 01, 2024Lis Pendens
Date: January 30, 2024POS COURT REPORTERS AVAILABILITY
Date: January 23, 2024Opp_App_Injunct_Proof_of_Service_2024_01_24
Date: January 25, 2024Memo_Opp_Prelim_Injunct_2024_01_24
Date: January 25, 2024POS David Hansen
Date: January 29, 2024POS Regina Hansen
Date: January 29, 2024Opp_Ex_Parte_Proof_of_Service_eFile
Date: January 22, 2024Hansen_s_Dec_Opposing_Ex_Parte_App_eFile
Date: January 22, 2024Memorandum_Opposing_Ex_Parte_App_eFile
Date: January 22, 2024POS David Hansen Ex Parte
Date: January 22, 2024POS Regina Victoria Hansen Ex Parte
Date: January 22, 2024First Amended Complaint
Date: January 20, 2024Memorandum PandAs ISO
Date: January 18, 2024Dec of Jimenez ISO Ex Parte
Date: January 18, 2024Notice of Ex Parte Application TRO
Date: January 18, 202420240117 Exhibits 11-12
Date: January 18, 202420240117 Exhibits 6-10
Date: January 18, 2024Dec of Peacock ISO Ex Parte
Date: January 18, 202420240117 Exhibits 1-5
Date: January 18, 2024POS Ex Parte TRO
Date: January 18, 2024Hansen_s_Dec_Opposing_Ex_Parte_App_FE
Date: January 25, 2024Opp_Ex_Parte_Proof_of_Service_eFile
Date: January 18, 2024Memorandum_Opposing_Ex_Parte_App_eFile
Date: January 18, 2024Hansen_s_Dec_Opposing_Ex_Parte_App_eFile
Date: January 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 4.22.24 CMC | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Process | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer AMENDED |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Process Proof of Service |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | First Amended Answer by All Defendants | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.