Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Doe, Jane, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Rights (08) case represented by Daniels, Janean, against Groom, Conal, Mission Rowing, Nagy, Carol, represented by Eck, John C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Rights (08) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges multiple claims against defendants Mission Rowing, Conal Groom, Carol Nagy, and Does 1-50. The plaintiff, Jane Doe, asserts claims for assault and battery, sexual battery, sexual harassment, gender violence, violation of civil ...
LA515142 answer
Date: April 25, 2024Answer
Date: April 23, 2024Third Amended Complaint for Damages
Date: March 22, 2024Mission Rowing's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition of Demurrer to SAC
Date: February 15, 2024Plaintiff Opposition to MISSION ROWING Demurrer to SAC
Date: February 08, 2024LA485017.CMS
Date: January 29, 2024Case Management Statement for 2-07-24
Date: January 26, 2024Case Management Statement (CMC 2-7)
Date: January 25, 2024Mission Rowings Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to SAC
Date: January 17, 2024Def Carol Nagy's Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 04, 2024Answer of Groom to Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 04, 2024SF181846.Answer
Date: January 02, 2024Def Carol Nagy's Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 03, 2024Second Amended Complaint for Damages
Date: December 01, 2023SC2069 - JANE DOE(2)
Date: April 26, 2023cm010 - JANE DOE(3)
Date: April 26, 2023Doe Complaint for Damages final
Date: April 26, 2023sum100 - JANE DOE
Date: April 26, 2023POS Groom 042823
Date: May 04, 2023POS Mission Rowing 042823
Date: May 04, 2023POS Nagy 042823
Date: May 04, 2023POS-050 EFS-050 POS Notice Case Assignment & CMC
Date: May 04, 2023Declaration of Prejudice
Date: May 17, 2023Declaration of Prejudice
Date: May 19, 202376346Notic01462f
Date: May 25, 202376346Decla02ab6e
Date: May 25, 202376346Decla03f874
Date: May 25, 202376346Proof06cf7f
Date: May 25, 202376346Memor044291
Date: May 25, 202376346Motio00b330
Date: May 25, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Disqualification/Challenge, Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: April 27, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Motion, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Motion: Strike
Date: June 28, 202377650Reply000860
Date: June 20, 202377650Proof016c8c
Date: June 20, 2023Reply, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration of JCE Re Motion to Strike
Date: June 23, 202377939Decla00fde3
Date: June 24, 202377939Proof012ee9
Date: June 24, 2023Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Declaration, Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Notice of Continued Hearing & Rescheduled CMC
Date: June 28, 2023Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2023Sub of Atty re Def. Carol Nagy
Date: July 19, 2023First Amended Complaint for Damages 080323
Date: August 04, 2023Summons Amended 080723
Date: August 07, 2023Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: August 16, 2023Plaintiff's Case Management Statement 081623
Date: August 17, 2023LA435975.5576520._Carol_Nagys_Demurrer
Date: September 06, 2023LA436827
Date: September 07, 2023POS US Rowing 083123
Date: September 07, 2023Mission Rowing's Notice of Demurrer & Demurrer
Date: September 12, 2023Plaintiff Opposition to Nagy Demurrer
Date: September 29, 2023Plaintiff Opposition to MISSION ROWING Demurrer
Date: September 29, 2023Mission Rowings Reply to Opp. to Demurrer
Date: October 05, 202384091REPLY00ffab
Date: October 05, 2023Plaintiff's Case Management Statement for 110823 CMC for filing
Date: October 23, 2023LA453669.CMS
Date: October 26, 2023Case Management Statement of Conal Groom
Date: October 26, 2023Case Management Statement (CMC 11-8)
Date: October 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | LA515142 answer | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Third Amended Complaint for Damages | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Mission Rowing's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition of Demurrer to SAC | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Opposition to MISSION ROWING Demurrer to SAC | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | LA485017 | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement for 2-07-24 | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement (CMC 2-7) | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Mission Rowings Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to SAC | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Def Carol Nagy's Answer to Second Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.