Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Order (Chanel Inc.)
Date: December 12, 2023EHA v. Chanel - Summons
Date: March 14, 2023EHA v. Chanel - CCCS
Date: March 14, 2023EHA v. Chanel - Complaint
Date: March 14, 20232023.04.05 EHA v. Chanel - POSS re Macy
Date: April 05, 20232023.04.20 EHA v. Chanel - POSS re Chanel
Date: April 26, 20231-not
Date: May 06, 2023Chanel and Macys Answer to Complaint
Date: May 22, 20232023.06.28 EHA v. Chanel - CMC Statement
Date: June 28, 20232023.06.28 EHA v. Chanel - POS CMC Statement
Date: June 28, 2023Notice of Order (Chanel Inc.)
Date: June 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Order (Chanel Inc.) | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Defendant Chanel, Inc., a New York corporation |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.