Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2023 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a representative action brought by Environmental Health Advocates, Inc. against Federici Brands LLC, Sephora USA, Inc., and Does 1 through 100. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants have failed to inform consumers in California ...
Notice of Order (Federici Brands)
Date: December 12, 2023EHA v. Federici Brands - CCCS
Date: February 03, 2023EHA v. Federici Brands - Complaint
Date: February 03, 2023EHA v. Federici Brands - Summons
Date: February 03, 2023EHA v. Federici - POSS NAR re Sephora
Date: March 02, 2023EHA v. Federici - POSS NAR re Federici
Date: March 02, 2023POS
Date: April 14, 2023Declaration
Date: April 14, 2023SF145427.5104425.Federici_Notice_of_Submission_to_Petition
Date: May 06, 2023002 EHA v. Federici - JN Decl iso Demurrer
Date: May 12, 20232023.05.12 EHA v. Federici - POS Demurrer
Date: May 12, 2023003 EHA v. Federici - Proposed Order
Date: May 12, 2023001 EHA v. Federici - Demurrer
Date: May 12, 20232023.05.16 EHA v. Federici - CMC Statement
Date: May 16, 2023POS re CMC Statement
Date: May 16, 2023EHA v. Federici Brands - CMC Statement
Date: May 19, 2023Notice of Order (Federici Brands)
Date: June 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Order (Federici Brands) | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.