Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Albino Guzman, Arturo Cruz, Barbarino Ramirez, Guillermo Ramirez, Leonel Martinez, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Complex - Other Unlimited case represented by Hector Rodriguez Martinez, Stanley Scott Mallison, against Aguilar Farming Inc., Cagliero Ranches, Inc., Central Cali Farm Labor, Filberto Aguilar Perez, J Lohr Vineyards, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Emilio A Rodriguez, Jennifer Douglas Phillips, Melissa Dawn Culp, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2023 |
CategoryComplex - Other Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
CCFL - FAC - FINAL - 04.17.24
Date: April 17, 2024CCFL - RA-010 04.10.24 (2)
Date: April 10, 20242024.04.05 JLOH02-02 Answer to FAC_FINAL
Date: April 05, 20242024.04.05 CAGLI01-02 Answer to FAC_FINAL
Date: April 05, 202494991JOINT00f6ff
Date: March 29, 2024CCFL - Ntc of Entry of Order 03.05.24
Date: March 05, 2024Stipulation for Leave to file FAC 1.12.2024
Date: January 13, 202488888CaseM00cebd
Date: December 22, 2023CCFL - Notice of Posting Jury Fees - FINAL 12.18.23
Date: December 19, 202387478Answe0021d3
Date: November 29, 2023Answer to Complaint - Cagliero Ranches Inc
Date: November 14, 2023Answer to Complaint - J. Lohr
Date: November 09, 2023CCFL- NAR Filberto Aguilar Perez Signed 10.30.23
Date: November 09, 2023CCFL- NAR CCFL Signed 10.30.23
Date: November 09, 2023CCFL - Summons 09-01-2023
Date: September 02, 2023CCFL - Complaint FINAL 09.01.23
Date: September 02, 2023CCFL - CCCS 09.01.2023
Date: September 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | CCFL - FAC - FINAL - 04.17.24 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | CCFL - RA-010 04.10.24 (2) | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.04.05 JLOH02-02 Answer to FAC_FINAL | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.04.05 CAGLI01-02 Answer to FAC_FINAL | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94991JOINT00f6ff | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CCFL - Ntc of Entry of Order 03.05.24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.