Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Christobal Fletes, Oscar Isidro Fletes, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert B Mobasseri, against Coast Hills Credit Union, General Motors, Llc, Gold Start Motors, Inc., represented by Mary Lynn Arens, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 19, 202496320Notic00e255
Date: April 19, 202496320Propo017ee0
Date: April 19, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 17, 202394666Decla01344a
Date: March 26, 202494666Oppos00e42b
Date: March 26, 2024Motion to Compel Depositions
Date: February 09, 2024Request to take Hearing Off Calendar
Date: February 01, 2024Notice of Withdrawal of Motions to Compel
Date: December 20, 2023Reply in Support of Motion to Compel
Date: December 07, 2023Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel
Date: December 07, 202387753Decla030ec3
Date: December 04, 202387753Decla020bd4
Date: December 04, 202387753Oppos0109dc
Date: December 04, 202387753Oppos0003f5
Date: December 04, 2023Amended Notice of Motion to Compel 2
Date: November 17, 2023Amended Notice Motion to Compel 1
Date: November 17, 2023Summons
Date: February 17, 2023Complaint
Date: February 17, 202372962Answe008cff
Date: March 24, 2023Notice of Firm Address Change
Date: April 20, 2023Proof of Service-General Motors LLC
Date: April 24, 2023Proof of Service-Coast Hills Credit Union
Date: April 24, 2023Proof of Service-Gold Start Motors
Date: May 04, 202375330Notic0091f2
Date: May 06, 202377275Chris00f01a
Date: June 13, 202377444CaseM00a798
Date: June 15, 2023Case Managaement Statement
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: June 16, 202377585Propo008285
Date: June 17, 202377585Notic00ecc9
Date: June 17, 2023Request for Entry of Default
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Continued Case Management Conference
Date: June 22, 2023MTC_RPDs_from_MFG_Set_1_Final
Date: August 10, 2023MTC_SROGs_from_MFG_Set_1_Final
Date: August 10, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: September 06, 202383000CaseM00b6db
Date: September 17, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance (2)
Date: September 22, 2023Motion to Compel Responses
Date: October 02, 2023Motion to Compel Responses by GM
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96320Notic00e255 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96320Propo017ee0 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition/Objections | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 94666Decla01344a | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 94666Oppos00e42b | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Depositions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.