Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Shawn Avery, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Radomir R Kirnos, against General Motors Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Mary Lynn Arens, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
94913PLAIN00c10a
Date: March 29, 202494532Separ028069
Date: March 23, 202494532Decla01a106
Date: March 23, 202494532Oppos0033f8
Date: March 23, 202493716Stipu004c85
Date: March 12, 202492312Separ03793e
Date: February 20, 202492312Motio00da07
Date: February 20, 202492312Decla02e39c
Date: February 20, 202492312Memor01dcc9
Date: February 20, 202492312Propo0439a0
Date: February 20, 202488002NOTIC00f179
Date: December 07, 202371076Civil012d79
Date: February 17, 202371076Compl007960
Date: February 17, 202371076Deman038030
Date: February 17, 202371076Summo0204fd
Date: February 17, 202372375Proof002451
Date: March 14, 202372884Answe0056e6
Date: March 23, 202375330Notic003745
Date: May 06, 202376046CaseM002fd3
Date: May 19, 202377275SHAWN005b95
Date: June 13, 202377380NOTIC00df23
Date: June 14, 202380647Notic00bf7c
Date: August 14, 202384070CaseM007a9c
Date: October 04, 202384393DECLA00bd09
Date: October 10, 202384818PLAIN002a28
Date: October 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94913PLAIN00c10a | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply | |
March 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 94532Separ028069 | |
March 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 94532Decla01a106 | |
March 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 94532Oppos0033f8 | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Signed | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | 93716Stipu004c85 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.