Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Fathy Sherif, against Espinoza Rudy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Rudy Espinoza (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: November 21, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 21, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 21, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: February 24, 2023Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Hearing |
Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading/default |
|
December 01, 2023 | Hearing |
Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650 Case Management Conference |
|
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading/default scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding...) | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading/default scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
October 02, 2023 | Hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading/default scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.