Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Moreno Erik, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Caceres Heydi, Gold Point Escrow Inc., Moreno Martha, Town Center Realtors Inc, represented by Brandelli Randolph J, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Olivia Rosales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Martha Moreno (Defendant); As to: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Complaint Quiet Title; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2023Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: October 02, 2023Notice of Pendency Action; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 11-15-22); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Notice to Appear And Or Produce; Filed by: Erik Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Heydi Caceres (Defendant)
Date: 2023-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 20, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 20, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 20, 2022Complaint - COMPLAINT QUIET TITLE
Date: May 20, 2022Answer
Date: June 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 26, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: September 26, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (BANKRUPTCY)
Date: October 28, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 26, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 09, 2022Objection - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 02, 2022Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Order - COURT ORDER/RULING (HEARING 11-15-22)
Date: November 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 04, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: November 15, 2022Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 27, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: January 31, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice (of Pendency of Action) Filed by Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE Filed by Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Court Order/Ruling (Hearing 11-15-22) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Complaint (Quiet Title) Filed by Erik Moreno (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Notice (of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)) Filed by Erik Moreno (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Martha Moreno (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Complaint (Quiet Title)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.