Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Sampson Michelle, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Carvalho Alberto, Lausd, represented by Hill Charlie L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2022 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: October 28, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: January 17, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alberto Carvalho (Defendant); LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Response To Defendant's Demurrer; Filed by: Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LAUSD (Defendant); As to: Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 26, 2023Certificate of Mailing for Order Of Exemption From Electronic Filing and Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Defe...)
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: LAUSD (Defendant); As to: Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 24, 2022Complaint
Date: June 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 24, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 24, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 18, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER
Date: September 06, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2022Reply - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: September 16, 2022Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (AMENDED)
Date: November 07, 2022Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: November 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 21, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIF...)
Date: December 07, 2022Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDMENT)
Date: December 22, 2022Answer
Date: January 12, 2023Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: January 17, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 17, 2023Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT PAPERS
Date: February 07, 2023Complaint Filed by Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) Filed by Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Response (To Defendant's Demurrer) Filed by Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed by Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike of Defendants ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Dismissing Plaintif...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alberto Carvalho (Defendant); LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to amend complaint - first amendment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice (Defendants Notice of Unavailability) Filed by LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by LAUSD (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Michelle Sampson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.