Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Doe Clg03277, John, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by De La Cerda, Pedro, against Carpinteria Unified School District, Doe School District, represented by Eck, John C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff John Doe CLG03277 against Defendants DOE SCHOOL DISTRICT and DOES 1-500. The complaint alleges various causes of action, including negligence, negligent supervision, negligent retention/hiring, negligent failure t...
CMC Statement 3.8.2024
Date: February 29, 2024District CMS 3-8-24
Date: February 22, 2024Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice
Date: December 19, 2023Ex Parte Application to Unseal Documents
Date: December 19, 2023Notice of Further CMC 3-8-24
Date: December 08, 2023Notice of Motion & Moton to Unseal Documents
Date: December 09, 2023CMC Statement
Date: November 22, 2023District CMS 12-8-23
Date: November 20, 2023SC2069
Date: December 22, 2022Notice of Filing Redacted Certs of Merit
Date: December 22, 2022cm010
Date: December 22, 2022Complaint
Date: December 22, 2022Ntc of Lodgment COMs
Date: February 27, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: March 14, 2023Summons
Date: March 14, 2023Proof of Service of Summons
Date: March 21, 2023Stipulation
Date: May 12, 2023Ex. A - Second Amended Complaint
Date: May 12, 2023Stipulation
Date: May 15, 2023Second Amended Complaint
Date: May 22, 2023Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Order, Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Notice, Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Stipulation, Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: December 23, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Order, Filed
Date: March 08, 2023Order, Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2023Answer of Defendant CUSD
Date: June 07, 2023Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: June 07, 2023Case Management Statement (CMC 8-9)
Date: July 27, 2023Case Management Statement for Filing
Date: July 27, 2023Defendant's Notice of Association of Co-Counsel - Doe v. Carpinteria
Date: September 19, 2023Doe v. CUSD - CMC Statement
Date: September 20, 2023CMC Statement 9.21.2023
Date: September 21, 2023Notice of CMC & Vacating Trial & MSC (Doe)
Date: October 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | CMC Statement 3.8.2024 | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | District CMS 3-8-24 | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application to Unseal Documents | |
December 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion & Moton to Unseal Documents | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Further CMC 3-8-24 | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC Statement | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | District CMS 12-8-23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.