Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Storke Ranch Master Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Denatale, Shannon E, Haskell, Christopher E, against Bilotti, Jaice, Bilotti, Janice, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2024.03.07 Motion for Attorneys' Fees
Date: March 07, 20242024.03.04 Request for Dismissal
Date: March 04, 20242022.07.07 CCS Addendum-signed
Date: July 11, 20222022.7.07 Civil Case Cover Sheet-signed
Date: July 11, 20222022.07.07 Summons
Date: July 11, 202222.06.30 Storke Ranch MA v. Bilotti v2-signed
Date: July 11, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: November 14, 20222022.08.08 POS
Date: August 16, 20222022.08.17 Notice of Order
Date: August 17, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: August 17, 20222022.10.25 CMC
Date: October 25, 202223.02.03 MTC Form Interrogs
Date: February 03, 202323.02.03 MTC Demand for Inspection
Date: February 03, 20232023.01.30 MTC Form Interrogs Sep Stmt
Date: February 03, 202323.02.03 MTC Demand for Inspection - Sep Statement
Date: February 03, 20232023.02.06 MTC RFP Sep Stmt
Date: February 06, 20232023.02.06 MTC RFP
Date: February 06, 20232023.02.24 CMC Statement
Date: February 24, 20232023.03.13 Ntc of Continued CMC
Date: March 13, 20232023.04.14 Case Management Statement
Date: April 14, 20232023.05.01 Notice of Ruling
Date: May 01, 20232023.05.01 MTC Form Interrogs
Date: May 01, 20232023.05.01 MTC RFP Sep Stmt
Date: May 01, 20232023.05.01 MTC RFP
Date: May 01, 20232023.05.01 MTC Form Interrogs Sep Stmt
Date: May 01, 20232023.05.01 MTC Demand for Inspection
Date: May 01, 20232023.05.01 MTC Demand for Inspection - Sep Statement
Date: May 01, 20232023.06.23 CMC (Storke Ranch)
Date: June 23, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 01, 2023Motion: Compel
Date: May 01, 2023Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: March 13, 2023Motion to Compel, Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Separate Statement, Filed
Date: May 01, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 23, 20232023.09.05 Motion for Sanctions RFP
Date: September 05, 20232023.09.05 Motion for Sanctions RFP Sep Stmt
Date: September 05, 20232023.09.05 Proposed Order
Date: September 05, 20232023.09.08 Case Management Statement
Date: September 08, 20232023.09.25 Notice of Ruling
Date: September 25, 20232023.10.16 Notice of Ruling
Date: October 16, 20232023.10.25 Ntc of Errata re Ntc of Ruling
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.07 Motion for Attorneys' Fees | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.04 Request for Dismissal | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.10.25 Ntc of Errata re Ntc of Ruling | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.10.23 Ntc of Ruling | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.10.16 Notice of Ruling | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.25 Notice of Ruling | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.08 Case Management Statement | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.05 Motion for Sanctions RFP | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.05 Motion for Sanctions RFP Sep Stmt | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.09.05 Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.