Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Robert Mosqueda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Amir Siamak Seid-Salehi, Shahab Mossavar-Rahmani, against Freedom Medical Transportation, Llc, Gabriela Gonzalez Blas, represented by Bradford Grice Hughes, Erin Chance, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Ps Notice of Settlement (FINAL)
Date: December 19, 202388131ExPar006012
Date: December 11, 202388131Oppos0380a3
Date: December 11, 202388148Notic009446
Date: December 11, 2023Separate Statement re MTQ D SUB 5 (FINAL)
Date: December 09, 2023Ps MTQ re D SUB 5 (FINAL)
Date: December 09, 202387714Notic00a55a
Date: December 04, 202387702Defen004cb5
Date: December 04, 202387446Motio00e55a
Date: November 29, 202387446Propo01a651
Date: November 29, 202387221PROPO0155ac
Date: November 23, 202387221NOTIC0059a7
Date: November 23, 20233 - Complaint (SIGNED)
Date: September 27, 20222 - Cover Sheet (SIGNED)
Date: September 27, 20221 - Summons (FINAL)
Date: September 27, 2022POS for Blas
Date: October 24, 2022POS for Freedom LLC
Date: October 24, 2022P Demand for Jury Trial (Final)
Date: November 08, 2022P Notice of Posting Jury Fees (Final)
Date: November 08, 202266583Defen000b88
Date: November 17, 202266732Defen005c8b
Date: November 21, 2022P CMC Statement (Final)
Date: January 17, 202369374Notic00fa1b
Date: January 17, 202369374CaseM0066c9
Date: January 17, 2023Ps Notice of Change of Handling Atty (FINAL)
Date: March 16, 202378198DEFEN00a42f
Date: June 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Ps Notice of Settlement (FINAL) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement Conditional All Parties | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Signed | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition/Objections | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 88131ExPar006012 | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 88131Oppos0380a3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.