Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bush, Antonio, Chatman, Precious, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by De Blouw, Nicholas J, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Wedriveu, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Braham, Christopher A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Finigan, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2022 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Precious Chatman against WeDriveU, Inc. The complaint alleges several violations of California labor laws. The violations include unfair competition in violation of California Business and Professio...
94249DEFEN00c23b
Date: March 19, 202494147MEMOR036e80
Date: March 18, 202494147PROPO026205
Date: March 18, 202494147Proof01361d
Date: March 18, 202494147DEFEN00484f
Date: March 18, 20242024-03-12 j - CMC Statement
Date: March 12, 20242024-03-07 SAC - Final
Date: March 07, 202493063NOTIC00764b
Date: March 01, 20242024-02-23 j- Stip for leave to file SAC
Date: February 23, 20242024-02-21- Notice of Association of Counsel
Date: February 21, 2024Declaration in Support
Date: April 28, 2023Case Management Order
Date: June 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 21, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: February 14, 2023First Amended Complaint
Date: January 05, 2024Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 01, 2023Motion to Consolidate
Date: May 12, 2023Complex Case Management Conference
Date: September 29, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 08, 2023Motion to Amend
Date: December 22, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 08, 2023Notice
Date: December 15, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 01, 2023Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: December 22, 2023Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved
Date: November 08, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 28, 2023Complex Case Management Conference
Date: May 12, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: April 20, 2023Answer
Date: August 23, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 05, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 01, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 06, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 09, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 02, 2023Order
Date: March 01, 2023Motion for Leave to File
Date: November 09, 2023Notice of Hearing re
Date: February 07, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: November 09, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 09, 2023Complaint
Date: June 02, 2022Notice of Hearing re
Date: October 02, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation
Date: April 20, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: April 28, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 21, 2023Order
Date: November 02, 2022Motion for Order
Date: May 12, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 01, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: November 08, 2023Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: July 26, 2022Joint Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2023Remand From District/Federal Court's Civil Docket
Date: November 02, 2022Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand
Date: November 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: January 27, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: November 02, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 15, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: June 02, 2022Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: June 02, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 02, 2022499361.1917229.2024
Date: February 15, 2024497958.1910536.final
Date: February 10, 202490661NOTIC00b5ec
Date: January 24, 202490136Joint00a8ad
Date: January 17, 2024Summons
Date: June 02, 2022p-Complaint
Date: June 02, 20222024-01-02 - FACC
Date: January 03, 20242023-12-15-p - Notice of Non-Opp
Date: December 16, 20232023-12-01- Reply- Motion for Leave to
Date: December 01, 20232023-12-01- POS
Date: December 01, 20232023-12-01 - Reply Motion for Leave to file
Date: December 01, 2023p-pos-summons
Date: July 26, 202262380ANSWE004729
Date: August 23, 202264122DEFEN006431
Date: September 29, 2022p-POS
Date: November 15, 202269966CaseM002b0a
Date: January 27, 20232023-01-30 p-cm110.v1 - Class.FINAL
Date: January 31, 20232023-01-31 - Joint CMS
Date: February 01, 202370242Notic0010fd
Date: February 02, 2023Oppo related- Class
Date: February 06, 202370874propo01b773
Date: February 14, 202370874Defen00fe8d
Date: February 14, 202374424propo016572
Date: April 20, 202374424Defen00a572
Date: April 20, 20232023-04-27 - p-POS
Date: April 28, 20232023-04-27 - p-Oppo Mot. to Consolidate.Final
Date: April 28, 20232023-04-27 - p-Decl CTL ISO-Oppo.Final
Date: April 28, 202375298DEFEN00d36c
Date: May 05, 20232023-05-04_Wedriveu_Jt CMS_Final
Date: May 05, 202385680State0090ff
Date: October 30, 20232023-11-08 - Motion to be Relieved
Date: November 09, 20232023-11-08 - POS
Date: November 09, 20232023-11-08 - Declaration
Date: November 09, 20232023-11-08 - Proposed Order
Date: November 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 94249DEFEN00c23b | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 94147MEMOR036e80 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 94147PROPO026205 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 94147Proof01361d | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 94147DEFEN00484f | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complex Case Management Conference
Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-12 j - CMC Statement | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-07 SAC - Final | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 93063NOTIC00764b |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.