Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kid, Safari, Mathur, Shanu, Mathur, Sudhir, Ss And Ar, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Price, Harry I, against Bjjf, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, represented by Johnston, Michael C., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2022 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by SS and AR, LLC, Sudhir Mathur, and Shanu Mathur, collectively referred to as "SAFARIKID," against BJJF, LLC, and unidentified defendants. SAFARIKID alleges that they entered into a commercial lease agreement with BJJF for a...
Complaint
Date: March 30, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 01, 2022Lis Pendens - Notice of Recordation and POS
Date: April 13, 2022POS of Summons
Date: April 18, 2022Motion Strike-Memo P&A
Date: May 12, 2022Demurrer-Memo P&A
Date: May 12, 2022Motion Strike-Decl Meet Confer
Date: May 12, 2022Demurrer-Notice and Demurrer
Date: May 12, 2022Demurrer-Decl Meet Confer
Date: May 12, 2022Motion Strike-Notice Motion and Motion
Date: May 12, 2022Motion Strike-Proof Service Mail Cover
Date: May 12, 2022Demurrer-Proof Service Mail Cover
Date: May 12, 2022Notice Unavailability Counsel for Defendant
Date: May 18, 2022MPA motion to strike
Date: June 13, 2022MTS oppposition - Declaration of Price
Date: June 13, 2022Opposition to Demurrer - Declaration of Price
Date: June 13, 2022MPA demurrer to complaint
Date: June 13, 2022POS061322
Date: June 13, 2022POS 061422
Date: June 14, 2022Motion to Consolidate - Decl of Price 061422
Date: June 14, 2022Motion to Consolidate - Notice 061422
Date: June 14, 2022Motion to Consolidate - MPA 061422
Date: June 14, 2022Motion to Consolidate - Decl of Mathur 061422
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: June 14, 2022Demurrer to Complaint
Date: May 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 12, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: May 12, 2022Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: May 18, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 13, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 12, 2022Declaration
Date: May 12, 2022Declaration
Date: May 12, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation
Date: June 14, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 13, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 12, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 18, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 14, 2022BJJF LLC Proof of Service
Date: June 20, 2022BJJF LLC's Reply Memo P&A Support Demur Cplt
Date: June 20, 2022BJJF LLC's Reply Memo P&A Support Strike Cplt
Date: June 20, 2022BJJF Join Support Oppose Motion Consolidate
Date: June 22, 2022BJJF Prf Serve Join Support Oppose Consolidate
Date: June 22, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 20, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 20, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 22, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 22, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 20, 2022Request for Dismissal 071122
Date: July 11, 2022POS 071122
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)
Date: April 13, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 30, 2022Summons
Date: March 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate TWO RELATED PENDING ACTIONS Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal 071122 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | POS 071122 | |
July 03, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE MARIE S. WEINER, Department 2 SUDHIR MATHUR, ET AL. VS. BJJF, LLC, ET AL. SUDHIR MATHUR HARRY I. PRICE BJJF, LLC MICHAEL C. JOHNSTON DEMURRERS OF DEFENDANT, BJJF, LLC, TO PLAINTIFFS’ ...
Judge: HONORABLE MARIE S. WEINER |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | BJJF Join Support Oppose Motion Consolidate | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | BJJF Prf Serve Join Support Oppose Consolidate | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.