Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daugherty Jeffrey Wadsworth, Kean Miller Llp, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Flattery Michael Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael W. Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael W. Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order
Date: October 13, 2022Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)
Date: June 02, 2021Will Deposited - 12 Pgs - Dated 05/18/2021
Date: June 07, 2021Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: June 16, 2021Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: June 16, 2021Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Probate
Date: June 24, 2021Will - Admitted
Date: July 02, 2021Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities
Date: July 02, 2021Order - Appointing Personal Representative
Date: July 07, 2021PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection
Date: July 13, 2021Letters (Initial)
Date: July 20, 2021Inventory & Appraisal - Final
Date: August 20, 2021Notice - Proposed Action
Date: August 20, 2021Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action
Date: September 24, 2021Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim
Date: September 24, 2021Notice - Notice to Franchise Tax Board
Date: September 24, 2021Creditor's Claim - Creditors Claim - Kean Miller LLP
Date: December 15, 2021Notice - Administration to Creditors - Corrected - Notice - Administration to Creditors
Date: December 15, 2021Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others)
Date: December 21, 2021Notice - Proposed Action
Date: March 17, 2022Inventory & Appraisal - Final
Date: April 28, 2022Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Account
Date: August 04, 2022Notice - Hearing - 10/13/22
Date: August 08, 2022Supplement - First Supplement to First and Final Account
Date: October 07, 2022Notice - Notice -Satisfaction of Creditor's Claim
Date: October 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Final Distribution | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Small Michael |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (The Account - Final or Waiver filed on by Petitioner(s) Jeffrey Wadsworth Daugherty ) | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supplement (First Supplement to First and Final Account ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice -Satisfaction of Creditor's Claim ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 07, 2022 | Supplement - First Supplement to First and Final Account | ||
October 07, 2022 | Notice - Notice -Satisfaction of Creditor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.