Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Department Of Health Care Services, Tolbert Susie Renee, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order - Probate
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 24, 2023Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003
Date: May 24, 2021Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)
Date: May 24, 2021PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection
Date: June 03, 2021Supplement - To Petition
Date: June 10, 2021Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary- Jerry Eatmon Jr.
Date: June 10, 2021Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary
Date: June 10, 2021Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary- Sherri Sterry
Date: June 10, 2021Summons
Date: June 10, 2021PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection
Date: June 10, 2021Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: June 10, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: July 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2021Notice - Petition to Administer Estate
Date: August 09, 2021Waiver - (No Fee)
Date: August 09, 2021Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order
Date: August 24, 2021Declaration - regarding Petitioner's Integrity
Date: October 06, 2021PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected
Date: November 02, 2021Letters (Initial)
Date: December 13, 2021Request - Special Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Withdrawal - Special Notice
Date: March 23, 2022Inventory & Appraisal - Partial No 1
Date: August 30, 2022Inventory & Appraisal - Partial No 2
Date: August 30, 2022Supplement - Verified Supplement to Clear Probate Notes
Date: February 15, 2023Status Report of Personal Representative - Status Report of Personal Representative
Date: March 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim Filed by Claimant |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal - Special Notice Filed by Claimant |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order (Order for Preliminary Distibution; Order Sent Via Mail on ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Accounting (Order Approving Preliminary Distribution ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Petition Hearing - Held Petition Hearing - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) (Allowed $836.41 Department of Health Care Services ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplement (Verified Supplement to Clear Probate Notes ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.