Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Old Republic Surety Company A Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pagan John Esq., against Alfaro Art, Chen An Individual Tim, Double Oak Construction Inc. A Corporation, Gral George, Gral Laurie, (total of 5) See All represented by Nadel Jeffrey David, Narvid Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark E. Windham presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Windham Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
General Denial; Filed by: George Gral (Defendant); Laurie Gral (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Motion to Deposit; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Double Oak Construction, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Old Republic Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 10, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 28, 2021Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 28, 2021Complaint in Interpleader - Complaint in Interpleader
Date: December 28, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2022General Denial - General Denial
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Answer - Answer
Date: March 09, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 17, 2022Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion re: to Deposit by Stakeholder
Date: March 17, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 17, 2022Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling on Motion to Deposit
Date: May 24, 2022Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.