Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Los Angeles Dept. Of Transportation filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against City Of Los Angeles Dept. Of Transportation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Katherine Chilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Chilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryParking Appeal (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Motion; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Appeal - Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Parking Appeal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Request for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Declaration; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order - Discovery Resolution; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: August 16, 2021Notice of Appeal - Notice of Appeal - Hearing on Parking Appeal
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Parking Appeal)
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal - Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal
Date: October 08, 2021Motion re: (name extension) - Motion
Date: November 30, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 15, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/15/2022
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: December 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration (name extension) - Declaration
Date: January 11, 2023Subpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service - Subpoena Duces Tecum and Proof of Service
Date: January 11, 2023Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation - No Order - Discovery Resolution
Date: January 11, 2023Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Admiranda Maxwell (Appellant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.