Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bunting Annette, Praetorian Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jamal Suliman, Markaryan Arg, against Rojo Felizardo Ayala, Rojo Trucking, represented by Sohrabian Tiffany E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Declaration of N. Michael Abed in support of Motion to Intervene; Filed by: Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Felizardo Ayala Rojo; On the Complaint filed by Annette Bunting on
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Felizardo Ayala Rojo; On the Complaint filed by Annette Bunting on
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Annette Bunting (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: MARKARYAN LAW, PC
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Praetorian Insurance Company (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 11, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: August 11, 2021PI General Order
Date: September 01, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 25, 2022Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 15, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF N. MICHAEL ABED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 02, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 03, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 20, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: May 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: June 09, 2022Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: July 29, 2022Complaint in Intervention - COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION [PROPOSED]
Date: June 10, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 05, 2022Answer
Date: August 10, 2022Answer
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: September 27, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND DISCOVERY CUT OFFS
Date: October 26, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Felizardo Ayala Rojo (Defendant); Rojo Trucking (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Felizardo Ayala Rojo (Defendant); Rojo Trucking (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE Filed by Praetorian Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Annette Bunting (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00DECLARATION OF N. MICHAEL ABED, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Affidavit (of Service of Motion to Intervene and Declaration of N. Michael Abed in support thereof)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Affidavit (of Service of Motion to Intervene and Declaration of N. Michael Abed in Support thereof)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.