Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Apolinar Claudia, Perez-Perez Emmanuel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Labat Germain D, Marron Michael, Mcguire James J., Peters Sara, against Polymer80 Inc. A Nevada Corporation, represented by Arens Russell R, Labat Germain D, Marron Michael, Mcguire James J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Claudia Apolinar (Plaintiff); Emmanuel Perez-Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Polymer80, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Polymer80, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 03, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Order re Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Polymer80, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED ...)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2021Complaint
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: August 11, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 16, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 20, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 08/27/2021
Date: August 27, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/27/2021
Date: August 27, 2021Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF SPENCER J. PAHLKE IN SUPPORT OF ANDREW NELLISS PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION
Date: September 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ERIC TIRSCHWELL PRO HAC VICE
Date: September 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW NELLIS PRO HAC VICE
Date: September 16, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SPENCER J. PAHLKE IN SUPPORT OF LEN KAMDANGS PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION;
Date: September 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LEN KAMDANG PRO HAC VICE
Date: September 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 12, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 16, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/16/2021
Date: December 16, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 29, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE OVERSIZE P & A'S)
Date: December 30, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 10, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Lien
Date: January 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 20, 2022Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: January 20, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 26, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 02, 2022Order - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: February 02, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER [PROPOSED]
Date: February 15, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: February 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAMES J. MCGUIRE, ESQ. AS COUNSEL TO DEFENDANT POLYMER80, INC.
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Claudia Apolinar (Plaintiff); Emmanuel Perez-Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Claudia Apolinar (Plaintiff); Emmanuel Perez-Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Polymer80, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Polymer80, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Polymer80, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 08/27/2021)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF SPENCER J. PAHLKE IN SUPPORT OF LEN KAMDANGS PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION;)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ERIC TIRSCHWELL PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LEN KAMDANG PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW NELLIS PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF SPENCER J. PAHLKE IN SUPPORT OF ANDREW NELLISS PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF SPENCER J. PAHLKE IN SUPPORT OF ERIC TIRSCHWELLS PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW NELLIS PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LEN KAMDANG PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted ...))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ERIC TIRSCHWELL PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Orders)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/16/2021)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Notice Of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to file oversize P & A's))
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE THE FEBRUARY 16, 2...))
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice (of Application)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/27/2021)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.