Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rios Jason, Rios Tanya, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Jamal Suliman Eric, Pinkney Ryan, Pinkney Ryan Eric, against Lake Havasu Houseboats Llc, Lake Havasu Houseboats Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Meyer Erin, Meyer Gary, represented by Cosgrove Edward Anthony, Lerner Neil S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lia R. Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLia R. Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 30, 2021Complaint
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 30, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE
Date: July 13, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Order - ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: August 16, 2021Answer
Date: September 22, 2021Answer - ANSWER AMENDED
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2021Order - ORDER - COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: January 27, 2023Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: January 30, 2023Complaint Filed by Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sage) Filed by Tanya Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Order (on Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Order (- Court's Case Management ORDER) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time on ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lake Havasu Houseboats, LLC (Defendant); Gary Meyer (Defendant); Erin Meyer (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss or Stay based on Forum Non Conve...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jason Rios (Plaintiff); Tanya Rios (Plaintiff); Sage Rios (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion for Forum Non Conveniens (Notice)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND RULING THEREON)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time on ...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sage)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (- DENIED)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition To Motion to Stay or Dismiss Based On Forum Non Conveniens)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss or Stay based on Forum Non Conve...))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Answer (Amended)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Order (on Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Order - Court's Case Management ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Order on Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND RULING THEREON
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Forum Non Conveniens
Date: July 01, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.