Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mccartney Selena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Raiser-Ca Llc, Raiser Llc, Tanaes Otto Mihai, Uber Technologies, represented by Arabi Arash Seyed Esq., Schroeder Thomas U. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: RAISER, LLC (Defendant); As to: Selena McCartney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: RAISER-CA LLC (Defendant); As to: Selena McCartney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Otto Mihai Tanaes (Defendant); OTTO MIHAI TANACS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: UBER Technologies (Defendant); As to: Selena McCartney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: OTTO MIHAI TANACS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: OTTO MIHAI TANACS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 11, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 11, 2021Complaint
Date: March 11, 2021PI General Order
Date: March 25, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: October 19, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 07, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 30, 2022Answer
Date: November 30, 2022Answer
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT...)
Date: December 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 17, 2023Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Small Claims Case 21WSC00117 trailing))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Small Claims Case 21IWSC00117 traili...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Selena McCartney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by RAISER-CA LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by Otto Mihai Tanacs Erroneously Sued As Otto Mihai Tanaes (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by OTTO MIHAI TANAES (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by UBER Technologies (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Selena McCartney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by RAISER, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge Pursuant...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Selena McCartney (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Selena McCartney (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Delay In Prosecution Pursuan...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by OTTO MIHAI TANAES (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.