Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arditi Scott Albert, Expert Car Washes Inc., National Car Washes Inc., Shouhed Shahriar, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mahavier R. Anthony, Vivoli Michael, Saccuzzo Jason P, against Arditi Scott Albert, Auto Care California Inc. A California Corporation As A Nominal Defendant As To Derivative Claims, Expert Car Washes Inc., represented by Coleman Derrick F, Graham Curtis A., Coleman Derrick F., Vivoli Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin S. Escalante Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Shahriar Shouhed (Cross-Defendant); As to: Scott Albert Arditi (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Hamid Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-10T00:00:00Opposition Joinder to Opposition to Motion to Disqualify; Filed by: Shahriar Shouhed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: National Car Washes, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rafie Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Farshid Shouhed (Cross-Defendant); Hamid Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Declaration of M. Yardley re Service of Opposition; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: National Car Washes, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Shahriar Shouhed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring or Moving party; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration of D. Coleman re Service of Opposition; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Shahriar Shouhed (Cross-Defendant); As to: Scott Albert Arditi (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Shahram Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-09T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Scott Albert Arditi; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Undertaking bond; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Decision on application for right to attach order: granted in part; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Decision on renewed application for right to attach order: denied; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Shahram Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Shahriar Shouhed (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Rafie Shouhed (Cross-Defendant); Shahram Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Rafie Shouhed (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 08, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 22, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY
Date: April 06, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 14, 2021Case Management Order
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 01, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: August 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: August 06, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 06, 2021Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: August 31, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: August 26, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE TO CONTINUE HEARING
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINAN...)
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AGAINST DEFENDA...)
Date: September 02, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 13, 2021Order - DECISION ON APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER: GRANTED IN PART
Date: September 02, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: September 13, 2021Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment
Date: September 14, 2021Undertaking - UNDERTAKING BOND
Date: September 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 22, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: September 22, 2021Writ of - WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: September 23, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY VIVOLI SACCUZZO, LLP
Date: September 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 29, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: October 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: October 13, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 25, 2021Answer
Date: October 25, 2021Writ of - WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AFTER HEARING
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: October 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 29, 2021Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: October 29, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 29, 2021Answer
Date: November 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF M. YARDLEY RE SERVICE OF OPPOSITION
Date: November 29, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF D. COLEMAN RE SERVICE OF OPPOSITION
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AGAINST DEFENDA...)
Date: November 30, 2021Order - DECISION ON RENEWED APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER: DENIED
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REPRESENTATION OF NATIONAL CAR WASHES, ...)
Date: December 15, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 04, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 03, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 03, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. VIVOLE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 07, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: February 08, 2022Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 08, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: February 09, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REPRESENTATION OF NATIONAL CAR WASHES, ...)
Date: February 10, 2022Answer
Date: March 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: April 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 25, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: August 12, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 26, 2022Answer
Date: August 26, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: September 12, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER
Date: September 12, 2022Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: September 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTR...)
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: November 09, 2022Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: January 06, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND OTHER CASE DATES
Date: January 03, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: January 17, 2023Answer
Date: February 06, 2023Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: March 09, 2023Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: March 10, 2023Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: March 21, 2023Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 21, 2023Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 29, 2023Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 29, 2023Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 10, 2023Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER
Date: April 10, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 20, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 21, 2023Order - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL
Date: April 24, 2023Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: April 24, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY R. ANTHONY MAHAVIER, A.P.L.C.
Date: April 25, 2023Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Representation of National Car Washes, ...))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant/Cross-Complainan...))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Writ of (Attachment After Hearing)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to Continue Hearing)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO Pending an OSC Why Pr...))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO Pending an OSC Why Pr...))
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Response (to Declaration of Michael W. Vivole in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to any Served Cro...))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO Pending an OSC Why Pr...))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Scott Albert Arditi (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael W. Vivoli in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Representation of National Car Washes, ...))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving party)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (Scott Albert Arditi)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to Continue Hearing)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant/Cross-Complainan...))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment Against Defenda...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Disqualify Vivoli Saccuzzo, LLP)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Writ of (Attachment After Hearing)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO Pending an OSC Why Pr...))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael W. Vivoli in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of D. Coleman re Service of Opposition)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment Against Defenda...))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO Pending an OSC Why Pr...))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Representation of National Car Washes, ...))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (of M. Yardley re Service of Opposition)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO Pending an OSC Why Pr...))
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Representation of National Car Washes, ...))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Response (to Declaration of Michael W. Vivole in Response to Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Writ of Attachment
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving party)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (Scott Albert Arditi)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of M. Yardley re Service of Opposition)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Writ of Attachment
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment Against Defenda...))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment Against Defenda...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Decision on renewed application for right to attach order: denied
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of D. Coleman re Service of Opposition)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Decision on application for right to attach order: granted in part
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Disqualify Vivoli Saccuzzo, LLP)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Writ of Attachment
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.