Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Waters Kimberly A., against Gray James, Gray Vickey, represented by Castano Orlando J Jr, Waters Kimberly A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR ASSIGNMENT OF CASE NUMBER
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 19, 2021Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: February 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)
Date: January 19, 2022Response to Petition
Date: February 22, 2022Petition - PETITION PETITION TO CORRECT CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: February 23, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CORRECT THE ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 01, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Petition (to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Arbitration))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; Hearing on M...))
Date: April 19, 2022Response to Petition
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Petition (Petition for Assignment of Case Number)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Opposition (TO PETITION TO CORRECT THE ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Reply (TO RESPONSE BY ALLSTATE FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM U.I.M. AMENDED ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; Hearing on M...) of )
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Petition (Petition for Assignment of Case Number)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.