Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Audelo-Gaxiola Alberto, People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Kimura Hikari, against Ninety-One Thousand Three Hundred Seventy-Two Dollars $91 372.00 In U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Fahey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a petition for forfeiture pursuant to Health and Safety Code section 11470, et seq. The petitioner, People of the State of California, is seeking the forfeiture of Ninety-One Thousand Three Hundred Seventy-Two Dollars ($91,372.00) i...
Claim Opposing Forfeiture; Filed by: Alberto Audelo-Gaxiola (Claimant); Amount Claimed: 91372.00
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Department 69 Online Courtroom Information; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 08, 2021Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: April 08, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 27, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: May 03, 2021Claim Opposing Forfeiture
Date: May 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT DATES
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION REQUESTING TO VACATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Stipulated Judgment - STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY
Date: August 09, 2021Stipulation for Judgment
Date: August 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Petition (Petition for Forfeiture Pursuant to Health and Safety Code Section 11470,ET SEQ.)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Claim Opposing Forfeiture
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT DATES)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (REQUESTING TO VACATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.