Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kreyssler Joan, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Francisconi Eric, against Canyon Country Enterprises A California Corporation, represented by Mayes Jeffrey C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James C. Chalfant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames C. Chalfant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Decision on petition to permit inspection of records: granted; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: February 17, 2022Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: February 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference; Filed by: Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 18, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: February 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: February 24, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO PETITION
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: April 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 05, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/05/2021
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: June 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 20, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 20, 2021Answer
Date: January 14, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: January 27, 2022Order - DECISION ON PETITION TO PERMIT INSPECTION OF RECORDS: GRANTED
Date: January 27, 2022Judgment
Date: February 14, 2022Writ of Mandate
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT)
Date: February 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Canyon Country Enterprises, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Decision on petition to permit inspection of records: granted Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: February 17, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing on Petition for Writ o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference) Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: February 15, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Answer (to Petition) Filed by Canyon Country Enterprises, a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Notice of Entry of Judgment and Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Writ of Mandate Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed by Joan Kreyssler (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Answer (to Petition)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/05/2021)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing on Petition for Writ o...))
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.