Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kim Jennifer G., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ho Denise, against Carter Shelli, Kim Thomas J., represented by Friedman David, Xu Jared, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig D. Karlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 15, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: November 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: November 10, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: November 23, 2021Proof of Service Not Plaintiff’s / Defendant’s Claim
Date: December 08, 2021Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: December 29, 2021Answer
Date: January 10, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 19, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANT SHELLI CARTER’S NOTI...)
Date: February 09, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 01, 2022Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; Filed by: Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Thomas J. Kim (Defendant); As to: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Thomas J. Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Case Management Conference; Filed by: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: DEFENDANT SHELLI CARTER?S NOTI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Filed by Shelli Carter (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (Case Management Conference) Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Thomas J. Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: August 01, 2022Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference) Filed by Jennifer G. Kim (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.