Related Content
in San Bernardino County
Case
Lvnv Funding Llc -v- Alvarez Print
Jun 27, 2024 |
. TBD |
Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
CIVSB2421159
Ruling
The People of the State of California vs. $1000.00 U.S. Currency
Jun 14, 2024 |
22CV-0199795
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 22CV-0199795
This consolidated asset forfeiture matter is on calendar for review regarding status of criminal
proceedings and amended petition. On October 30, 2023, the Court was informed that trial on the
criminal matter was scheduled for January 2024. No amended petition has been filed. No status
report has been filed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to provide the Court
with a status of the criminal proceeding and amended petition.
Ruling
The People of the State of California vs. $17,038.22 U.S. Currency
Jun 27, 2024 |
24CV-0204451
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 24CV-0204451
This matter is on calendar for status. Claimant Ryan Montgomery filed a Claim Opposing
Forfeiture on March 6, 2024. The People of the State of California filed a Petition for Forfeiture
on March 11, 2024. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the status of
any underlying criminal matter.
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS. $19,619.00
Ruling
BALAZS, et al. vs. PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, et al.
Jun 21, 2024 |
CVCV21-0198434
BALAZS, ET AL. VS. PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, ET AL.
Case Number: CVCV21-0198434
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of stay of the proceedings following the matter being
coordinated as part of JCCP 5165 in San Francisco County. Defendant filed a Status Conference Statement
informing the Court that a mandatory settlement conference to address the claims of all remaining Plaintiffs in
the coordinated proceeding is set for June 27, 2024. Defendant requests a continuance of three months. This
matter is continued to Monday, September 16, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 63 for review regarding status
of JCCP. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
PEOPLE VS. $179, 635.00 U.S. CURRENCY
Jun 14, 2024 |
CVPT20-0195154
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: CVPT20-0195154
This matter is on calendar for review regarding trial readiness. This matter is set for a half-day
court trial commencing on Tuesday, June 25, 2024, at 8:45 a.m. in Department 64. An appearance
is necessary on today’s calendar.
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS. $18,000.00
Ruling
People vs. CHATWELL, MAURA TERESA
Jun 24, 2024 |
['S-PR-0012803', 'S-PR-0012806']
S-PR-0012803 In Re the Terry J Russell Liv Trust
Petition to determine trust property is recommended for approval as prayed.
||18. S-PR-0012806 In Re the Estate of Chiang, Francisco Siu-Leung
Revised allegations and prayer are needed for petition to administer estate. The
allegations and prayer for relief are in irreconcilable conflict, as follows: petitioner seeks to
probate a lost will (caption), but petitioner alleges decedent died intestate (¶ 3f(1)) and
seeks intestate administration (¶ 2b(3)); petitioner does not pray for admission of a will (¶
2a)). No copy of any will or description of any will is provided, and petitioner fails to allege
that the original was lost or to provide the required Prob.C. § 6124 lost will statement (¶
3f(2)-(3) & Attachment 3f(2)); however, petitioner alleges there is a will which waives bond
(¶ 3e(1)). Petitioner seeks appointment of an administrator but no executor or
administrator with will annexed (¶¶ 2b(3) & 3g(1)-(2)), and no person is identified as a
proposed executor (¶ 8)).
New notice of hearing and service are required. Two notices were filed April 18: the
required DE-121 states that petitioner seeks admission of a will to probate (¶ 4), which
statement was included in publication. As above, no will is offered for probate by
petitioner. The inapplicable DE-120 states that petitioner seeks admission of a will to
probate and appointment of an administrator with will annexed. As above, there are
neither allegations nor a prayer for appointment of administrator with will annexed. Note
further that any amended petition will require new notice, service, and publication. C.R.C.
7.53.
Petition omits required allegations at ¶ 5a(3)-(4) (RDP) and (7)-(8) (issue of
predeceased child(ren).
Missing waivers of bond by Alicia Chiang and Albina Chiang.
Ruling
The People of the State of California vs. $19,619.00 U.S. Currency
Jun 24, 2024 |
24CV-0204434
U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 24CV-0204434
This matter is on calendar for status. Claimant Lazaro Rios Ordaz filed a Claim Opposing
Forfeiture on March 4, 2024. The People of the State of California filed a Petition for Forfeiture
on April 24, 2024. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the status of
any underlying criminal matter.
Ruling
BALAZS, et al. vs. PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, et al.
Jun 19, 2024 |
CVCV21-0198434
BALAZS, ET AL. VS. PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, ET AL.
Case Number: CVCV21-0198434
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of stay of the proceedings following the matter being
coordinated as part of JCCP 5165 in San Francisco County. Defendant filed a Status Conference Statement
informing the Court that a mandatory settlement conference to address the claims of all remaining Plaintiffs in
the coordinated proceeding is set for June 27, 2024. Defendant requests a continuance of three months. This
matter is continued to Monday, September 16, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 63 for review regarding status
of JCCP. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
FASSBINDER, et al. vs. PG&E CORPORATION, et al.
Jun 22, 2024 |
CVCV21-0198186
FASSBINDER, ET AL. VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL.
Case Number: CVCV21-0198186
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of the JCCP. No Status Report has been filed. An
appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to provide the Court with a status of the JCCP proceedings.