Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Net Protect Worldwide Ltd Dba Takedown Czar A Hong Kong Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Polychron Chris, against Leung Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph C. Hofer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Complaint
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 22, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 22, 2021Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 24, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 23, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2021Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Leung (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Leung (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice complaint) Filed by Net Protect Worldwide, Ltd (Plaintiff)
Date: September 08, 2021Complaint
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 05/13/2021)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.