Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bird Rides Inc., filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Portnoi Dimitri Daniel, Suvor Daniel R, against City Of Santa Monica, Lyft Inc., Skinny Labs Inc., Veoride Inc., Wheels Labs Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Dutton Holly, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell L. Beckloff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: September 01, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: June 30, 2021Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWARD CASTILLO IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: June 30, 2021Other - - PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (EXHIBITS 7-8)
Date: June 30, 2021Other - - PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (EXHIBITS 9-13)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON A. ORR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Other - - PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (EXHIBIT 8)
Date: June 30, 2021Other - - PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (EXHIBITS 1-6)
Date: June 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALEX FRIENDLY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: July 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) TEMPORAR...)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: July 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN ADLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 09, 2021Summons - SUMMONS TO AMENDED PETITION
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Objection - RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: July 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: July 30, 2021Order - ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 31, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST LYFT, INC.
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 07, 2021Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: October 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 25, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 13, 2022Separate Statement
Date: April 13, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 29, 2022Joinder
Date: April 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 04, 2022Order - ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 23, 2022Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Skinny Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Veoride, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Respondent)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: Skinny Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Order Denying Motion to Compel Depositions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 9-13) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: Wheels Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Other - Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 1-6); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Skinny Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 7-8) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 9-13); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 7-8); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Declaration of Jason A. Orr in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibit 8) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Wheels Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Declaration of Alex Friendly in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons (to Amended Petition) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibit 8); Filed by: Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Order Denying Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Wheels Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Jason A. Orr in Support of Ex Parte Application) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 1-6) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Veoride, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Friendly in Support of Ex Parte Application) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for (1) Temporar...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by City of Santa Monica (Respondent)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Order (Denying Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Skinny Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion to Compel Depositions) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: August 23, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed by Skinny Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Skinny Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Wheels Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bird Rides, Inc. (Petitioner)
Date: August 23, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel the Depositions of Tim McCormick,...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Wheels Labs Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF JONATHAN ADLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Jason A. Orr in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 7-8)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibit 8)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Summons (to Amended Petition)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Castillo in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Amended PetitionVERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT (1st)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Friendly in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 1-6)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for (1) Temporar...))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICAS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 9-13)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Alexander Keating in Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Reply (Bird Rides, Inc.'s Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (iso Lyft's Opposition to Bird's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (RESPONDENT CITY OF SANTA MONICAS OPPOSITION TO BIRDS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Opposition (RESPONDENT CITY OF SANTA MONICAS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Order (Denying Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice (OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST LYFT, INC.)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion to Compel Depositions)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (THE DEPOSITIONS OF TIM MCCORMICK, SHANNON PARRY, CYNTHIA CAIMAN, AND ADAM COHEN)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel the Depositions of Tim McCormick,...))
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 7-8)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Jason A. Orr in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 1-6)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICAS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons (to Amended Petition)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Motion for Preliminary ...))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Amended PetitionVERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT (1st)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Reply (Bird Rides, Inc.'s Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (iso Lyft's Opposition to Bird's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibits 9-13)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate (Exhibit 8)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Alexander Keating in Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Castillo in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for (1) Temporar...))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Alex Friendly in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (RESPONDENT CITY OF SANTA MONICAS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Order (Denying Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice (OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST LYFT, INC.)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF JONATHAN ADLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.