Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
King, Terri S, King, Thadias B, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Porter, Jordan T, against Jm Sewall & Associates, Sewall, Jock M, represented by Chao, Louis R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort (35) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
[King] Ntc of Entry of Order 04.25.22
Date: April 26, 2022SEWALL_DEC_ISO_MSJ
Date: June 07, 2022Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Complaint, Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: February 16, 2021CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Order, Filed
Date: April 20, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2021[King] Ex Parte App to Continue MSJ and Trial Dates 08.30.22
Date: August 30, 2022OPPO_TO_EX_PARTE_SEWALL_
Date: August 31, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Summons Issued, Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Certificate, Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: April 21, 2021Demand for Trial by Jury, Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: June 07, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: September 01, 20222. [King] Separate Statement in Opp 10.31.22 FINAL
Date: November 01, 20227. [King] RJN ISO Opp MSJ 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20224. [King] Decl. of Thadias King ISO Opp to MSJ 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20225. [King] Decl. Porter ISO Opp MSJ 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20228. [King] POS 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20223. [King] Obj ISO Opp MSJ 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20226. [King] Appendix of Evidence Vol. II 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20226. [King] Appendix of Evidence Vol. I 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 20221. [King] Opp to Defendants MSJ 10.31.22
Date: November 01, 2022OBJ_TO_THE_THADIAS_KING_DECL
Date: November 10, 2022DECL_OF_LRC_ISO_REPLY_TO_MSJ_002_
Date: November 10, 2022OBJECTION_TO_PORTER_DEC
Date: November 10, 2022RESPONSE_TO_ADDITIONAL_MATERIAL_FACTS
Date: November 10, 2022REPLY_ISO_OF_MSJ
Date: November 10, 2022[King] Notice of Settlement of Entire Case 03.08.23
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | [King] Notice of Settlement of Entire Case 03.08.23 | |
December 05, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Summary Judgment
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Summary Judgment
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 14, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion for Summary Judgment This matter is continued to December 5, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Dept. 5. No appearance is required on November 14, 2022.
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Summary Judgment
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OBJ_TO_THE_THADIAS_KING_DECL | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DECL_OF_LRC_ISO_REPLY_TO_MSJ_002_ | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | OBJECTION_TO_PORTER_DEC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.