Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Peric, Deborah Kelly Garland, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Reed, Nikolaus W, against Does 1 To 50, Lotus Hospitality Ii, Inc., represented by Donaldson, Malcolm D., Leff, Samuel A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Deborah Kelly Garland Peric against Lotus Hospitality II, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Lotus Hospitality II, Inc. and seeks damages for injuries sustained by the plaintiff. The...
94984Reque0076c2
Date: March 29, 20242.21.24 Ntc of Settlement_Signed Not Filed
Date: February 22, 2024Joint Pretrial Stmt Signed
Date: February 12, 202491483propo062953
Date: February 06, 202491483Defen039dd5
Date: February 06, 202491483propo043f07
Date: February 06, 202491483Defen01466b
Date: February 06, 202491483propo05bdac
Date: February 06, 202491483propo07eb3d
Date: February 06, 202491483Defen00e755
Date: February 06, 202491483Defen02dfe2
Date: February 06, 202491405Respo053560
Date: February 06, 202491405Defen04c603
Date: February 06, 20242.5.24 Ptfs Opposition to MIL 1
Date: February 05, 20242.5.24 Dec of NWR in Supp of Ptfs MIL
Date: February 05, 20242.5.24 Ptfs Opposition to MIL 3
Date: February 05, 20242.5.24 Ptfs MIL to Deem RFAs Admitted
Date: February 05, 20242.5.24 Ptfs MIL to Preclude Evidence
Date: February 05, 202491405Motio039307
Date: February 06, 202491405Motio024e9f
Date: February 06, 202491405Motio0123c2
Date: February 06, 202491405Defen00d360
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: September 14, 2021Complaint
Date: September 14, 202152740Notic00cd56
Date: January 29, 202255400Stipu00855e
Date: March 28, 202261797State00ed29
Date: August 10, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 31, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2022ADR Referral
Date: March 03, 2022CMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR
Date: July 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2022CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: December 30, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: March 30, 2022Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: February 25, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process
Date: June 20, 202263198Notic000159
Date: September 09, 20229.26.22 Case Mgmt Stmt_Signed Not Filed
Date: September 26, 20229.26.22 PoS to Case Mgmt Stmt_Signed Not Filed
Date: September 26, 202264286CaseM009815
Date: October 03, 202277971Notic0045ba
Date: June 26, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 31, 202380565NOTIC004425
Date: August 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94984Reque0076c2 | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7 DAY EST Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference IN-PERSON Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2.21.24 Ntc of Settlement_Signed Not Filed | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint Pretrial Stmt Signed | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 91483propo062953 | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 91483Defen039dd5 | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 91483propo043f07 | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 91483Defen01466b |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.