Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Shee, Frank, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Bolanos, Alberto, Md, Sutter Bay Hospital, represented by Willoughby, Robert S., Zenere, James J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2021MTC-NOTICE - JJZ
Date: March 22, 2022MTC-DEC JJZ
Date: March 22, 2022MTC-POS - JJZ
Date: March 22, 2022MTC-MPA- JJZ
Date: March 22, 2022Shee CMC Stmt (Bolanos) for 5-18-22
Date: April 29, 2022MTC-Reply
Date: May 02, 2022Sutter CMCS
Date: May 03, 2022MSJ-MPA
Date: May 23, 2022SSUMF
Date: May 23, 2022MSJ-NOTICE
Date: May 23, 2022Evidence-Combined
Date: May 23, 2022MSJ-POS
Date: May 23, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: August 19, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: May 04, 2021MTC-AMENDED NOTICE - JJZ
Date: September 20, 2022MTC-SUPP DEC JJZ
Date: September 20, 2022ORDER RE MTC.docx
Date: October 24, 2022Shee PO Cover
Date: October 24, 2022Shee CMS (Bolanos) for 11-16-22
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 06, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: September 01, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 07, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: January 05, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 20, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 05, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: January 06, 2022Motion to Amend
Date: May 02, 2022Sutter CMCS 11.16.22
Date: October 31, 2022NTE Order MTC
Date: November 03, 2022Declaration
Date: April 13, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: May 04, 2021job_7947165_pos_050_judgment
Date: November 16, 2022Summery_judment_7927_
Date: November 16, 2022job_7947165_pos_050_diswilloughby
Date: November 16, 2022job_7947165_pos_050_dis_Zenere
Date: November 16, 20227 MSJ-Bolanos Decl
Date: November 18, 20222 MPAs
Date: November 18, 20224 MSJ Decl w exhibits
Date: November 18, 20223 SSUMF
Date: November 18, 20226 MSJ-Hennin Decl
Date: November 18, 20228 MSJ-Kao Decl
Date: November 18, 20221 MSJ-Notice
Date: November 18, 20225 MSJ-Kim Decl
Date: November 18, 2022job_7947165_pos_050_dis_Zenere
Date: November 22, 2022job_7947165_pos_050_judgment_2
Date: November 22, 2022Summery_judment_7927_2
Date: November 22, 2022job_7947165_pos_050_diswilloughby
Date: November 22, 2022Proposed Order Objections to Evidence Shee
Date: November 30, 2022MSJ REPLY-POS
Date: November 30, 2022Objections to Evidence Shee
Date: November 30, 2022Reply
Date: November 30, 2022Shee PO Cover - Prop Judgment
Date: December 13, 2022Shee PO Cover - MSJ ORDER
Date: December 13, 2022MSJ-PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 14, 2022Shee PO Cover - MSJ ORDER
Date: December 14, 2022MSJ-PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022Shee PO Cover - Prop Judgment
Date: December 14, 2022Shee NTE Order and Judgment
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: December 27, 2022Sutter CMCS 2.8.23
Date: January 23, 2023Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: October 04, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 18, 2022Notice
Date: July 26, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2022Evidence
Date: May 23, 2022Dismissal
Date: February 07, 2023Dismissal
Date: February 08, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: June 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 22, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: September 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2021Answer
Date: August 23, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: August 23, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 11, 2021Declaration
Date: July 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 25, 2021CMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending.
Date: May 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 04, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: May 04, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: March 23, 2021Complaint
Date: February 08, 2021Fee Waiver Granted
Date: February 08, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 06, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: March 22, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: January 06, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: August 19, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 18, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 23, 2022Motion to Amend
Date: December 30, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: November 03, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 02, 2022Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: November 18, 2022PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: October 24, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: November 18, 2022Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: July 19, 2022Order
Date: October 31, 2022Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: September 20, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 20, 2022Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 09, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: May 23, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 03, 2022Non-Opposition to
Date: May 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 22, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: February 08, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 04, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
2:00 FRANK SHEE VS. ALBERTO BOLANOS, MD, ET AL. FRANK SHEE PRO SE ALBERTO BOLANOS JAMES J. ZENERE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT SUTTER BAY HOSPI...
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Sutter CMCS 2.8.23 | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Shee NTE Order and Judgment | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MSJ-PROPOSED ORDER | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Shee PO Cover - MSJ ORDER | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MSJ-PROPOSED JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.