Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Klacp Ii Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Awa Nnana, Block Dennis P, Lee Jun S, against Lee Sandra S., Ok Woo Myong, Park Steve H., Won Kyoung Sook, represented by Awa Nnana, Grigoryan Hayk, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with George F. Bird, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF TRIAL; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application work sheet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by KLACP II, LLC on , judgment entered on as to Sandra S. Lee is
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by KLACP II, LLC on , judgment entered on as to Steve H. Park is
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant); As to: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 133.33
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 133.33
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 133.33
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: November 22, 2021Other - Ruling re: motion for summary judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Chin Pyung Yi (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Chin Pyung Yi (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Attachment; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Request for Admissions; Hearing o...)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Answer - Answer
Date: February 05, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 05, 2020Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: February 05, 2020Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: March 02, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)
Date: March 20, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 08, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: April 23, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: July 29, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]
Date: April 24, 2020Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 04, 2020Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference re: Non-Jury Trial;)
Date: December 29, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 05, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice OF TRIAL
Date: January 14, 2021Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request for Production and Copies
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request for Admissions
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request form Interrogatories
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: March 02, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: March 16, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Non-Jury Trial)
Date: March 17, 2021Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 30, 2021Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: April 01, 2021Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application work sheet
Date: April 16, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: April 26, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta))
Date: April 29, 2021Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 03, 2021Answer - Answer
Date: May 06, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: May 07, 2021Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney
Date: May 11, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: May 13, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 27, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: June 17, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE
Date: June 23, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice To Appear At Trial In Lieu of Subpoena
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: July 23, 2021Notice (name extension) - Notice To Appear At Trial In Lieu of Subpoena
Date: July 23, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: August 18, 2021Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession
Date: October 26, 2021Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession
Date: October 26, 2021Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 10, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta) Chin Pyung Yi)
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: November 22, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: December 06, 2021Updated -- On the Complaint filed by KLACP II, LLC on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by KLACP II, LLC on , judgment entered on as to Woo Myong Ok is
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by KLACP II, LLC on , judgment entered on as to Kyoung Sook Won is
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 133.33
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 03/20/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF TRIAL; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant); As to: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Won Ho Lee (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Chin Pyung Yi (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Attachment; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Chin Pyung Yi (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice (name extension) - Notice Order Lifting Automatic Stay Re 924 S. Park View
Date: August 13, 2021Order (name extension) - Order re: motion for summary judgment
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: August 24, 2021Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession
Date: August 30, 2021Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession
Date: August 30, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return No Writ Attachment Received
Date: September 30, 2021Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession
Date: October 01, 2021Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession
Date: October 04, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: October 25, 2021Attachment - Attachment
Date: November 09, 2021Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Woo Myong Ok (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Steve H. Park (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.