Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Horton Alec, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Panagos Giorgio Odysseus, Ryu Young W, against Haltom Riv, Mw Bhcc Llc Dba Griffin Club Los Angeles, Nasseri Bita, represented by Abraham Stephen, Mallgrave Deborah S, Yang Jason, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MW BHCC, LLC (Defendant); As to: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: RIV HALTOM (Defendant); As to: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BITA NASSERI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BITA NASSERI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice Of Entry of Judgement or Order; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application; Filed by: BITA NASSERI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff); As to: MW BHCC, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: BITA NASSERI (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BITA NASSERI (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgement or Order; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 28, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET TWO
Date: September 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: October 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; HEAR...)
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: November 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: November 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 12, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 07, 2021Status Report
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Lien
Date: January 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 28, 2022Status Report - STATUS REPORT IN PREPARATION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 31, 2022Status Report
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Setting of Informal Discovery ...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion Of Defendant Mw Bhcc, Llcs Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Status Report (PLAINTIFF ALEC HORTON'S STATUS REPORT)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (In support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFP, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Form Interrogatories - General, Set Two)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry of Judgement or Order)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgement or Order)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/03/2021)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Status Report (IN PREPARATION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BITA NASSERI (Defendant); As to: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Status Report PLAINTIFF ALEC HORTON'S STATUS REPORT; Filed by: ALEC HORTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Status Report - STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFF ALEC HORTON'S STATUS REPORT
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 30, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 27, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Jury Trial ((5-7 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial ((5-7 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
August 29, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial Judge: Jon R. Takasugi |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
August 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: Jon R. Takasugi |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
June 27, 2022 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.