Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amos Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Weber Esq. Edward T., against 1 Through 25 Inclusive Does, Keybank National Association A Corporation, Mccoy Laura M., Mccoy Michael P., represented by Walser-Jolly Genevieve, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Disclaimer OF INTEREST; Filed by: Keybank National Association, a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 14, 2020Complaint
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 15, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: February 16, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 05, 2021Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Date: March 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 14, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 07, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 03, 2021Stipulated Judgment
Date: June 03, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Stipulated Judgment Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: August 19, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Disclaimer (OF INTEREST) Filed by Keybank National Association, a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Disclaimer (OF INTEREST)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.